This case was last updated from PACER on 01/01/2021 at 08:36:32 (UTC).

Lopez v. Life Care Centers of America, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/02/2020 Lopez filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Life Care Centers of America, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District. The Judges overseeing this case are Laura Fashing and John F. Robbenhaar. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01128

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Laura Fashing

Referral Judge

John F. Robbenhaar

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Todd Lopez

Defendants

Phillip Nickse

Life Care Center of America, Inc.

Life Care Center of Farmington

Farmington Operations, LLC

Life Care Centers of America, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nichole Lynn Henry

Attorney at Whitener Law Firm, P.A.

4110 Cutler Avenue Ne

Albuquerque, NM 87110

Joshua K Conaway

Attorney at Fadduol, Cluff, Hardy & Conaway, P.C.

3301 San Mateo Blvd Ne

Albuquerque, NM 87110

Carlos E Sedillo

Attorney at Fadduol, Cluff, Hardy & Conaway, PC

3301 San Mateo Blvd., Ne

Albuquerque, NM 87110

Defendant Attorneys

Patrick A. Coronel

Attorney at Rodey, Dickason, Sloan, Akin & Robb, P.A.

201 Third Street, N.W., Suite 2200

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Denise Michelle Chanez

Attorney at Rodey, Dickason, Sloan, Akin & Robb, P.A.

Po Box 1888

Albuquerque, NM 87103

Sandra L Beerle

Attorney at Rodey, Dickason, Sloan, Akin & Robb

Po Box 1888

Albuquerque, NM 87103-1888

Jose R Blanton

Attorney at The Rodey Law Firm

P.O. Box 1888

Albuquerque, NM 87103

Angelica M. Lopez

Attorney at Rodey Dickason Sloan Akin & Robb, PA

Po Box 1888

Albuquerque, NM 87103

Jeffrey M. Croasdell

Attorney at Rodey, Dickason, Sloan, Akin & Robb

Po Box 1888

Albuquerque, NM 87103-1888

Alexandra Waleko

Attorney at Rodey, Dickason, Sloan, Akin & Robb, P.A.

201 Third St Nw, Suite 2200

Albuquerque, NM 87102

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) ORDER by District Judge Judith C. Herrera Consolidating Motion to Remand #4 with other Motions to Remand in cases, named herein, that all involve common questions of law and fact and the motions to remand all involve the same issue. (baw) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Todd Lopez re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Todd Lopez (Sedillo, Carlos) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick A. Coronel on behalf of All Defendants (Coronel, Patrick) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

#9

No Description Available

#8

(#8) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Life Care Center of America, Inc.. (Blanton, Jose) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Farmington Operations, LLC. (Blanton, Jose) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

#4

(#16) RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Farmington Operations, LLC, Life Care Center of America, Inc., Life Care Center of Farmington, Phillip Nickse. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Waleko, Alexandra) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

#3

(#3) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Rule 16(c) Hearing set for 12/16/2020 at 04:00 PM before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Five minutes prior to the start of the Conference, the parties shall call the AT&T Conference line at 888-363-4735, Access Code 2387395, to connect to the proceedings. Joint Status Report due by 12/7/2020. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 11/23/2020. (smd) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#1

(#20) NOTICE by Farmington Operations, LLC, Life Care Center of Farmington, Life Care Centers of America, Inc., Phillip Nickse re #16 Response in Opposition to Motion, #1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Waleko, Alexandra) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

#1

(#20) NOTICE by Farmington Operations, LLC, Life Care Center of Farmington, Life Care Centers of America, Inc., Phillip Nickse re #16 Response in Opposition to Motion, #1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Waleko, Alexandra) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MOTION to Strike #22 Response, to Notice of Supplemental Authority by Farmington Operations, LLC, Life Care Center of Farmington, Life Care Centers of America, Inc., Phillip Nickse. (Waleko, Alexandra) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Plaintiff's RESPONSE to Defendants' Notice of Supplemental Authority re #20 Notice (Other), filed by Todd Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Fourth Amendment to the Declaration, #2 Exhibit Fourth Advisory Opinion 20-04) (Sedillo, Carlos) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) FILED IN ERROR - Plaintiff's RESPONSE to Defendants' Notice of Supplemental Authority re #20 Notice (Other), filed by Todd Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Fourth Amendment to the Declaration, #2 Exhibit Fourth Advisory Opinion 20-04) (Sedillo, Carlos) Modified on 12/23/2020 (arp). (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE by Farmington Operations, LLC, Life Care Center of Farmington, Life Care Centers of America, Inc., Phillip Nickse re #16 Response in Opposition to Motion, #1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Waleko, Alexandra) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER by District Judge Judith C. Herrera Consolidating Motion to Remand #4 with other Motions to Remand in cases, named herein, that all involve common questions of law and fact and the motions to remand all involve the same issue. (baw) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Todd Lopez re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Todd Lopez (Sedillo, Carlos) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Todd Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Maglioli Complaint) (Sedillo, Carlos) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Farmington Operations, LLC, Life Care Center of America, Inc., Life Care Center of Farmington, Phillip Nickse. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Waleko, Alexandra) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick A. Coronel on behalf of All Defendants (Coronel, Patrick) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE OF RULE 73 CONSENT Received by All Parties. Related documents: 13 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Farmington Operations, LLC, 11 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Todd Lopez, 12 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Life Care Center of Farmington, Life Care Center of America, Inc., Phillip Nickse, 6 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Todd Lopez. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Life Care Center of America, Inc.. (Blanton, Jose) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Farmington Operations, LLC. (Blanton, Jose) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • Docket(#6) CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Todd Lopez voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Sedillo, Carlos)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER FINDING GOOD CAUSE TO DELAY SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. The Court vacates all instructions,deadlines, and hearings in the Initial Scheduling Order (Doc. 3) and will reschedule the scheduling conference after the Motion to Remand has been resolved by the Court. (smd) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Todd Lopez. (Sedillo, Carlos) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Rule 16(c) Hearing set for 12/16/2020 at 04:00 PM before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Five minutes prior to the start of the Conference, the parties shall call the AT&T Conference line at 888-363-4735, Access Code 2387395, to connect to the proceedings. Joint Status Report due by 12/7/2020. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 11/23/2020. (smd) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • Docket(#2) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketUnited States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing and United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar assigned. (jg) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number ANMDC-7387101 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Life Care Center of Farmington, Farmington Operations, LLC, Life Care Center of America, Inc., Phillip Nickse (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Coronel, Patrick) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from First Judicial District Court - County of Santa Fe, case number D-101-CV-2020-01937. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Exhibit C)(Coronel, Patrick) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Farmington Operations, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where LIFE CARE CENTERS OF AMERICA INC is a litigant