This case was last updated from PACER on 02/09/2020 at 07:57:56 (UTC).

LOPEZ v. CITY OF LANCASTER

Case Summary

On 12/11/2019 LOPEZ filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against CITY OF LANCASTER. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is EDWARD G. SMITH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-05828

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

EDWARD G. SMITH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GERALDA LOPEZ

Defendant

CITY OF LANCASTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JONATHAN W. CHASE

Attorney at RUPPERT MANES NARAHARI

1628 Jfk Boulevard, Suite 1650

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Defendant Attorney

CHRISTINE E. MUNION

Attorney at LAW OFFICES WILLIAM J. FERREN & ASSOCIATES

10 Sentry Parkway, Suite 301

Blue Bell, PA 19422

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against CITY OF LANCASTER ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE208157.), filed by GERALDA LOPEZ. (Attachments: #1 CASE FORMS)(jl, ) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CITY OF LANCASTER. CITY OF LANCASTER waiver sent on 12/18/2019, answer due 2/16/2020. (MUNION, CHRISTINE) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTINE E. MUNION on behalf of CITY OF LANCASTER with Jury Demand(MUNION, CHRISTINE) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

1 #1

CASE FORMS

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CITY OF LANCASTER. CITY OF LANCASTER waiver sent on 12/18/2019, answer due 2/16/2020. (MUNION, CHRISTINE) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTINE E. MUNION on behalf of CITY OF LANCASTER with Jury Demand(MUNION, CHRISTINE) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by GERALDA LOPEZ. (jl, ) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • Docket1 Summons Issued as to CITY OF LANCASTER. Forwarded To: JONATHAN CHASE on 12/12/19 (jl, ) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against CITY OF LANCASTER ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE208157.), filed by GERALDA LOPEZ. (Attachments: #1 CASE FORMS)(jl, ) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.