This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/08/2020 at 08:35:07 (UTC).

Lopez v. Arizona, State of et al

Case Summary

On 10/09/2020 Lopez filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Arizona, State of. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judges overseeing this case are Deborah M Fine (PS), John J Tuchi and Deborah M Fine. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01972

  • Filing Date:

    10/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Courthouse:

    Arizona District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John J Tuchi

Referral Judges

Deborah M Fine (PS)

Deborah M Fine

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Francisco Lopez

Defendants

Centurion of Arizona LLC

ACI-AZ Incorporated

Arizona, State of

Alliance Truss LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jody Lynn Broaddus

Attorney at Attorneys for Freedom Law Firm

3185 S Price Rd.

Chandler, AZ 85248

Marc Jeffrey Victor

Attorney at Attorneys for Freedom Law Firm

3185 S Price Rd.

Chandler, AZ 85248

Defendant Attorneys

Sarah Lynn Barnes

Attorney at Broening Oberg Woods & Wilson PC - Phoenix, AZ

2800 N Central Ave., Ste. 1600

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Joseph Edward Dylo

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General - Phoenix

2005 N Central Ave.

Phoenix, AZ 85004-1592

Ekaterina Sokolova

Attorney at Sanders & Parks PC

3030 N 3Rd St., Ste. 1300

Phoenix, AZ 85012-3099

Mark G Worischeck

Attorney at Sanders & Parks PC

3030 N 3Rd St., Ste. 1300

Phoenix, AZ 85012-3099

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) ORDER granting #19 Stipulation: The Telephonic Case Management Conference is vacated and continued to 2/10/21, at 11:00 a.m. Plaintiff's response to Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Medical Negligence Claim shall be filed no later than 1/15/21. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah M Fine on 12/2/20. (DXD) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

19 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#19

(#19) STIPULATION to Continue the Joint Case Conference, and to Extend the Deadline for Plaintiff's Response to the Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Medical Negligence Claim by Francisco Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Broaddus, Jody) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

#18

(#18) ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - Pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, a Telephonic Case Management Conference is set for January 7, 2021, at 10:30 a.m. in courtroom 304, Sandra Day O'Connor U.S. Courthouse, 401 W. Washington St., Phoenix, Arizona 85003-2151. (See document for complete details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah M Fine on 11/24/20. (SLQ) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

#17

(#17) ORDER - IT IS ORDERED granting Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion to Extend the Deadline to Respond to Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Medical Negligence Claim (Doc. #16 ). Plaintiffs response to Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Medical Negligence Claim shall be filed no later than November 30, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah M Fine on 11/24/20. (SLQ) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

16 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#16

(#16) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant's Partial Motion to Dismiss by Francisco Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Broaddus, Jody) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

#15

(#15) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Centurion of Arizona LLC. (Barnes, Sarah) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

#14

(#14) NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Centurion of Arizona LLC. (JAMA) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE re: Regarding Plaintiff's Custody Status by Francisco Lopez . (Broaddus, Jody) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER - Plaintiff must file a notice informing the Court of Plaintiff's custody status within 10 days of the filing date of this Order. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 10/20/20. (DXD) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alliance Truss LLC. (Sokolova, Ekaterina) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Alliance Truss LLC, Centurion of Arizona LLC. (REK) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (REK) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

1 #3

Supplemental Cover Sheet

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

***State Court record received on 10/09/2020***ANSWER to Complaint re: #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Alliance Truss LLC.***filed in State Court on unknown date, docketed in U.S. District Court on 10/09/2020 for case management purposes.***(REK) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER granting #19 Stipulation: The Telephonic Case Management Conference is vacated and continued to 2/10/21, at 11:00 a.m. Plaintiff's response to Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Medical Negligence Claim shall be filed no later than 1/15/21. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah M Fine on 12/2/20. (DXD) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) STIPULATION to Continue the Joint Case Conference, and to Extend the Deadline for Plaintiff's Response to the Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Medical Negligence Claim by Francisco Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Broaddus, Jody) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - Pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, a Telephonic Case Management Conference is set for January 7, 2021, at 10:30 a.m. in courtroom 304, Sandra Day O'Connor U.S. Courthouse, 401 W. Washington St., Phoenix, Arizona 85003-2151. (See document for complete details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah M Fine on 11/24/20. (SLQ) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER - IT IS ORDERED granting Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion to Extend the Deadline to Respond to Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Medical Negligence Claim (Doc. #16 ). Plaintiffs response to Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Medical Negligence Claim shall be filed no later than November 30, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah M Fine on 11/24/20. (SLQ) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant's Partial Motion to Dismiss by Francisco Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Broaddus, Jody) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Centurion of Arizona LLC. (Barnes, Sarah) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Centurion of Arizona LLC. (JAMA) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Alliance Truss, LLC's ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Alliance Truss LLC.(Sokolova, Ekaterina) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims : Count II - Negligence Claim by Arizona, State of, Centurion of Arizona LLC. (Barnes, Sarah) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Centurion of Arizona LLC.(Barnes, Sarah) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE re: Regarding Plaintiff's Custody Status by Francisco Lopez . (Broaddus, Jody) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER - Plaintiff must file a notice informing the Court of Plaintiff's custody status within 10 days of the filing date of this Order. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 10/20/20. (DXD) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alliance Truss LLC. (Sokolova, Ekaterina) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Alliance Truss LLC, Centurion of Arizona LLC. (REK) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (REK) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***State Court record received on 10/09/2020***ANSWER to Complaint re: #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Alliance Truss LLC.***filed in State Court on unknown date, docketed in U.S. District Court on 10/09/2020 for case management purposes.***(REK) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • Docket***State Court record received on 10/09/2020***SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Francisco Lopez: Return of Service re: Summons, Complaint, and Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration upon ACI-AZ Incorporated on 9/21/2020.***Return of Service filed in State Court on 9/23/2020, docketed in U.S. District Court on 10/09/2020 for case management purposes.*** (REK) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • Docket***State Court record received on 10/09/2020***SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Francisco Lopez: Return of Service re: Summons, Complaint and Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration upon Alliance Truss LLC on 9/15/2020.***Return of Service filed in State Court on 9/16/2020, docketed in U.S. District Court on 10/09/2020 for case management purposes.*** (REK) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • Docket***State Court record received on 10/09/2020***SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Francisco Lopez: Return of Service re: Summons, Complaint, and Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration upon Centurion of Arizona LLC and State of Arizona on 9/10/2020.***Returns of Service filed in State Court on 9/10/2020, docketed in U.S. District Court on 10/09/2020 for case management purposes.*** (REK) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2020-094974. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-18761477 filed by Centurion of Arizona LLC. (submitted by Sarah Barnes) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplemental Cover Sheet)(REK) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Centurion of Arizona LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jody Lynn Broaddus

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marc Jeffrey Victor