This case was last updated from PACER on 11/15/2021 at 09:01:05 (UTC).

Lopez Lugo v. FCA US LLC

Case Summary

On 09/16/2021 Lopez Lugo filed a Property - Personal Property Product Liability lawsuit against FCA US LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are James V. Selna, Shashi H. Kewalramani and David O. Carter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-01579

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Product Liability

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Shashi H. Kewalramani

Presiding Judges

James V. Selna

David O. Carter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jose Lopez Lugo

Defendants

FCA US LLC

Jeep Chrysler Dodge Ram Fiat of Ontario

Does 1 through 10, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Tionna Dolin

Attorney at Strategic Legal Practices APC

1840 Century Park East Suite 430

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Daniel A Law

Attorney at Strategic Legal Practices APC

1840 Century Park East Suite 430

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Defendant Attorney

Matthew M Proudfoot

Attorney at Gates Conter Guy Proudfoot and Muench LLP

38 Discovery Suite 200

Irvine, CA 92618

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of San Bernardino #13 filed by Plaintiff Jose Lopez Lugo. (Law, Daniel) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

13 #3

Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Remand

13 #2

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Re

13 #1

Declaration of Daniel Law in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand

13 #13

Main Document

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Daniel A Law on behalf of Plaintiff Jose Lopez Lugo (Attorney Daniel A Law added to party Jose Lopez Lugo(pty:pla))(Law, Daniel) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

#11

(#11) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 12/20/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (dgo) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

#10

(#10) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (dgo) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

#9

(#9) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge James V. Selna. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 21-01. Case randomly reassigned from Judge James V. Selna to Judge David O. Carter for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:21-cv-01579 DOC(SHKx). (rn) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

1 #2

Answer to Complaint - State Court

1 #1

Summons & Complaint - State Court

1 #1

Main Document

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2021
  • Docket(#15) SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter: The Scheduling Conference previously scheduled for 12/20/2021 at 8:30 AM has been rescheduled. Scheduling Conference reset for 12/13/2021 at 8:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of San Bernardino #13 filed by Plaintiff Jose Lopez Lugo. (Law, Daniel) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of San Bernardino filed by Plaintiff Jose Lopez Lugo. Motion set for hearing on 12/13/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel Law in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #2 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #3 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Remand) (Law, Daniel) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Daniel A Law on behalf of Plaintiff Jose Lopez Lugo (Attorney Daniel A Law added to party Jose Lopez Lugo(pty:pla))(Law, Daniel) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 12/20/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (dgo) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (dgo) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge James V. Selna. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 21-01. Case randomly reassigned from Judge James V. Selna to Judge David O. Carter for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:21-cv-01579 DOC(SHKx). (rn) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint, filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, Jeep Chrysler Dodge Ram Fiat of Ontario. (FILED IN SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 8/5/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 )(lh) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Jose Lopez Lugo. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Jose Lopez Lugo. (FILED IN SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 6/18/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case and Notice re Consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case was initially assigned to District Judge John W. Holcomb and referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 21-01, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge James V. Selna. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:21-cv-01579 JVS (SHKx). (lh) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, (Proudfoot, Matthew) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Matthew M Proudfoot on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Proudfoot, Matthew) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DECLARATION of Matthew M. Proudfoot re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Proudfoot, Matthew) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Proudfoot, Matthew) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Bernardino, case number CIVSB2117639 Receipt No: ACACDC-31994072 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons & Complaint - State Court, #2 Answer to Complaint - State Court) (Attorney Matthew M Proudfoot added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Proudfoot, Matthew) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JEEP CHRYSLER DODGE RAM FIAT OF ONTARIO is a litigant

Latest cases where FCA US LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew Millard Proudfoot