This case was last updated from PACER on 10/28/2019 at 07:53:05 (UTC).

Lopez et al v. Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The

Case Summary

On 08/29/2019 a Contract - Insurance case was filed by Lopez against Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Colorado District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-02456

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

S. Kato Crews

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Debbie Lopez

Daniel Lopez

Defendant

Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 10/10/19. (amont, ) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

#17

(#17) COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews: Scheduling Conference held on 10/10/2019. Discovery due by 5/8/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 6/5/2020. Joint Status Report due by 12/20/2019. FTR: Courtroom C-201. (amont, ) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

#16

(#16) Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiffs Daniel Lopez, Debbie Lopez. (Sar, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

#14

(#14) MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE, by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. Case returned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-2456-DDD (angar, ) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

#12

(#12) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The All parties do not consent.. (Walls, William) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

#11

(#11) ANSWER to #2 Complaint , Separate and Affirmative Defenses, and Jury Demand by Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The.(Walls, William) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Amy M. Samberg on behalf of Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, TheAttorney Amy M. Samberg added to party Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The(pty:dft) (Samberg, Amy) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jonathan Shawn Sar on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Jonathan Shawn Sar added to party Daniel Lopez(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan Shawn Sar added to party Debbie Lopez(pty:pla) (Sar, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/02/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Sean Bradley Leventhal on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Sean Bradley Leventhal added to party Daniel Lopez(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Bradley Leventhal added to party Debbie Lopez(pty:pla) (Leventhal, Sean) (Entered: 09/02/2019)

#6

(#6) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

#3

(#3) RETURN of Service of Summons, Complaint upon Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company on 8 August, 2019 (cmadr, ) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT for Damages and Jury Demand against Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The, filed by Daniel Lopez, Debbie Lopez.(cmadr, ) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

1 #9

Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet-Federal

1 #8

Exhibit Ex. H-Notice of Removal State

1 #7

Exhibit Ex. G-Certificate of Good Standing

1 #5

Exhibit Ex. E-Delay Reduction Order

1 #4

Exhibit Ex. D-Return of Service

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, a Connecticut corporation from Arapahoe County District Court, Case Number 2019CV31765. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6868836), filed by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, a Connecticut corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A-Complaint, #2 Exhibit Ex. B-Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Ex. C-Register of Actions, #4 Exhibit Ex. D-Return of Service, #5 Exhibit Ex. E-Delay Reduction Order, #6 Exhibit Ex. F-Summons, #7 Exhibit Ex. G-Certificate of Good Standing, #8 Exhibit Ex. H-Notice of Removal State, #9 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet-Federal)(Walls, William) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 10/10/19. (amont, ) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews: Scheduling Conference held on 10/10/2019. Discovery due by 5/8/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 6/5/2020. Joint Status Report due by 12/20/2019. FTR: Courtroom C-201. (amont, ) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiffs Daniel Lopez, Debbie Lopez. (Sar, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • (#15) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Crews. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on September 16, 2019. Text Only Entry (dddlc2) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE, by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. Case returned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-2456-DDD (angar, ) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #12 Consent/Non-Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-02456-LTB. (Text Only Entry) (jgonz, ) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The All parties do not consent.. (Walls, William) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ANSWER to #2 Complaint , Separate and Affirmative Defenses, and Jury Demand by Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The.(Walls, William) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • (#10) MINUTE ORDER Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 10/10/2019 11:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order, and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 10/3/2019. Consent Form due by 10/3/2019. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 9/5/19. Text Only Entry (amont, ) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Amy M. Samberg on behalf of Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, TheAttorney Amy M. Samberg added to party Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The(pty:dft) (Samberg, Amy) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jonathan Shawn Sar on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Jonathan Shawn Sar added to party Daniel Lopez(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan Shawn Sar added to party Debbie Lopez(pty:pla) (Sar, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Sean Bradley Leventhal on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Sean Bradley Leventhal added to party Daniel Lopez(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Bradley Leventhal added to party Debbie Lopez(pty:pla) (Leventhal, Sean) (Entered: 09/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • (#5) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • (#4) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) RETURN of Service of Summons, Complaint upon Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company on 8 August, 2019 (cmadr, ) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT for Damages and Jury Demand against Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The, filed by Daniel Lopez, Debbie Lopez.(cmadr, ) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, a Connecticut corporation from Arapahoe County District Court, Case Number 2019CV31765. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6868836), filed by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, a Connecticut corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A-Complaint, #2 Exhibit Ex. B-Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Ex. C-Register of Actions, #4 Exhibit Ex. D-Return of Service, #5 Exhibit Ex. E-Delay Reduction Order, #6 Exhibit Ex. F-Summons, #7 Exhibit Ex. G-Certificate of Good Standing, #8 Exhibit Ex. H-Notice of Removal State, #9 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet-Federal)(Walls, William) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less