This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/18/2020 at 10:19:58 (UTC).

Lopez et. al. v. New York Community Bancorp, Inc.et. al.

Case Summary

On 06/19/2020 Lopez filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against New York Community Bancorp, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gary R. Brown and Steven Tiscione. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-02741

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gary R. Brown

Referral Judge

Steven Tiscione

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Michelle Lopez

Joseph Giuffre

Defendants

New York Community Bancorp, Inc.

New York Community Bank

New York Commercial Bank

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael John Palitz

Attorney at Shavitz Law Group, P.A.

800 3Rd Avenue, Suite 2800

New York, NY 10022

Gregg I. Shavitz

Attorney at Shavitz Law Group, P.A.

951 Yamato Road, Suite 285, 33431

Boca Raton, FL 33431

Logan A Pardell

Attorney at Shavitz Law Group, P.A

951 Yamato Road, Suite 285

Boca Raton, FL 33431

Paolo C. Meireles

Attorney at Shavitz Law Group, P.A.

1515 S Federal Higjhway, Suite 404

Boca Raton, FL 33432

Defendant Attorneys

Gary Moy

Attorney at Littler Mendelson P.C.

900 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Timothy Steven Anderson

Attorney at Littler Mendelson

1100 Superior Avenue, 20Th Floor

Cleveland, OH 44114

 

Court Documents

#18

#17

16 #2

Certificate of Good Standing

16 #1

Affidavit of Timothy S. Anderson

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

Proposed Summons NEW YORK COMMUNITY BANK

1 #2

Proposed Summons NEW YORK COMMUNITY BANCORP, INC.

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person initial conference will be held before the undersigned at 11:00 a.m. on October 19, 2020 in Courtroom 710 of the Central Islip Courthouse located at 100 Federal Plaza. Counsel for all parties must attend. The Discovery Plan Worksheet must be completed and electronically filed with the Court no later than October 16, 2020. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 8/17/2020. (Vasquez, Lea) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: Having reviewed the Pro Hac Vice application #16 submitted by Timothy Steven Anderson for Defendants and found it to be in compliance with the local rules concerning attorney admissions, the application is approved. If not already done, the attorney shall register for ECF which is available online at the NYED's homepage. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notifications of activity in this case. The attorney shall also ensure that the $150 admission fee is submitted or has been submitted to the Clerk's Office. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 8/17/2020. (Vasquez, Lea) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by New York Commercial Bank, New York Community Bancorp, Inc., New York Community Bank. (Moy, Gary) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-13212943. by New York Commercial Bank, New York Community Bancorp, Inc., New York Community Bank. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Timothy S. Anderson, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (Anderson, Timothy) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Logan A Pardell on behalf of All Plaintiffs (notification declined or already on case) (Pardell, Logan) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Paolo C. Meireles on behalf of All Plaintiffs (notification declined or already on case) (Meireles, Paolo) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Gregg I. Shavitz on behalf of All Plaintiffs (notification declined or already on case) (Shavitz, Gregg) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #7 #8 & #9 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: Having reviewed the Pro Hac Vice applications #7 #8 #9 submitted by Gregg I. Shavitz, Logan A. Pardell and Paolo C. Meireles, respectively, for Plaintiffs and found them to be in compliance with the local rules concerning attorney admissions, the applications are approved. If not already done, the attorneys shall register for ECF which is available online at the NYED's homepage. Once registered, the attorneys shall file notices of appearance and ensure that they receive electronic notifications of activity in this case. The attorneys shall ensure that the $150 admission fee, per application, is submitted or has been submitted to the Clerk's Office. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 7/16/2020. (Vasquez, Lea) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Michelle Lopez, Joseph Giuffre. New York Commercial Bank waiver sent on 7/13/2020, answer due 9/11/2020. (Palitz, Michael) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Michelle Lopez, Joseph Giuffre. New York Community Bancorp, Inc. waiver sent on 7/13/2020, answer due 9/11/2020. (Palitz, Michael) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-13073919. by Joseph Giuffre, Michelle Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Meireles, Paolo) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-13073890. by Joseph Giuffre, Michelle Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Pardell, Logan) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-13073824. by Joseph Giuffre, Michelle Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Shavitz, Gregg) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE by Michelle Lopez of Filing Consent to Join of Opt-in No. 2 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent Form) (Palitz, Michael) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to New York Commercial Bank, New York Community Bancorp, Inc., New York Community Bank. (Vanderbilt, Evelyn) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Vanderbilt, Evelyn) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for additional corrections that were made. (Vanderbilt, Evelyn) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Gary R. Brown and Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Vanderbilt, Evelyn) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12952846 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No. filed by MICHELLE LOPEZ, JOSEPH GIUFFRE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons NEW YORK COMMUNITY BANCORP, INC., #3 Proposed Summons NEW YORK COMMUNITY BANK) (Palitz, Michael) Modified on 6/22/2020 (Vanderbilt, Evelyn). (Entered: 06/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where New York Community Bancorp, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where New York Community Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Timothy S. Anderson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gary Moy