This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/18/2022 at 08:06:18 (UTC).

Lopez et al v. National Freight Inc et al

Case Summary

On 08/19/2022 Lopez filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against National Freight Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Karen Gren Scholer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-01844

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Karen Gren Scholer

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Luis Lopez

Ambioris Jimenez

Defendants

National Freight Inc

NFI Interactive Logistics LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Drew N Herrmann

Pamela Herrmann

Harold L Lichten

Sarah Schalman-Bergen

Thomas Pierce Fowler

Defendant Attorneys

Alicia Sienne Voltmer

Christiana Signs

James N Boudreau

 

Court Documents

29 #1

Exhibit(s) App. 001 - 198

29 #29

Main Document

28 #1

Proposed Order

28 #28

Main Document

27 #1

Exhibit(s) App. 001 - 003

27 #27

Main Document

26 #1

Proposed Order

26 #26

Main Document

17 #17

Main Document

6 #2

Proposed Order

6 #6

Main Document

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to NFI Interactive Logistics LLC, National Freight Inc. (ndt) (Entered: 08/25/2022)

4 #1

Exhibit(s)

4 #4

Main Document

#3

(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mlb) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AMBIORIS JIMENEZ, Luis Lopez. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Herrmann, Drew) (Main Document 2 replaced to flatten pdf on 8/19/2022) (mlb). (Entered: 08/19/2022)

1 #1

Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#4) NOTICE of Request for the Issuance of Summonses re: #1 Complaint,,,,, filed by Ambioris Jimenez, Luis Lopez (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Herrmann, Drew) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Appendix in Support filed by NFI Interactive Logistics LLC, National Freight Inc re #28 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) App. 001 - 198) (Voltmer, Alicia) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) MOTION to Dismiss filed by NFI Interactive Logistics LLC, National Freight Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Voltmer, Alicia) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Appendix in Support filed by NFI Interactive Logistics LLC, National Freight Inc re #26 Response/Objection (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) App. 001 - 003) (Voltmer, Alicia) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by NFI Interactive Logistics LLC, National Freight Inc re: #17 Amended MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Voltmer, Alicia) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ELECTRONIC ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that #24 Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiffs' Amended Motion to Transfer Venue, to and including October 11, 2022, is GRANTED. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 9/30/2022) (chmb) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #18 Appendix in Support, #17 Amended MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division filed by NFI Interactive Logistics LLC, National Freight Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Signs, Christiana) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #21 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Christiana Signs. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 9/20/2022) (chmb) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #19 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of James N Boudreau. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 9/20/2022) (chmb) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-13155741) filed by NFI Interactive Logistics LLC, National Freight Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1 - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit(s) 2 - Court's Admitted to Practice, #3 Proposed Order)Attorney Christiana Signs added to party NFI Interactive Logistics LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Christiana Signs added to party National Freight Inc(pty:dft) (Signs, Christiana) (Entered: 09/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ELECTRONIC ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the #16 Agreed Motion to Extend Answer Deadline, to and including October 17, 2022, is GRANTED. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 9/14/2022) (chmb) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to NFI Interactive Logistics LLC; served on 8/26/2022. (Lichten, Harold) (Entered: 09/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Harold L Lichten. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/29/2022) (chmb) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Thomas Pierce Fowler. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/29/2022) (chmb) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-13069166) filed by Ambioris Jimenez, Luis Lopez (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Fowler, Thomas) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-13069143) filed by Ambioris Jimenez, Luis Lopez (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Lichten, Harold) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to NFI Interactive Logistics LLC, National Freight Inc. (ndt) (Entered: 08/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Request for the Issuance of Summonses re: #1 Complaint,,,,, filed by Ambioris Jimenez, Luis Lopez (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Herrmann, Drew) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mlb) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AMBIORIS JIMENEZ, Luis Lopez. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Herrmann, Drew) (Main Document 2 replaced to flatten pdf on 8/19/2022) (mlb). (Entered: 08/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by AMBIORIS JIMENEZ, Luis Lopez. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-13050022) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Herrmann, Drew) (Attachment 1 replaced to flatten pdf on 8/19/2022) (mlb). (Entered: 08/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less