This case was last updated from PACER on 01/14/2020 at 08:31:13 (UTC).

Zerib et al v. Feteer Factory Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/15/2019 Zerib filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Feteer Factory Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are James Orenstein and Margo K. Brodie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-06472

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

James Orenstein

Presiding Judge

Margo K. Brodie

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Nabil Zerbib

Vera Lopez

Cirilo Vera Lopez

Nabil Zerib

Defendants

Feteer Factory Inc.

Mourad A Mourad

Oga Boutros

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lina Stillman

Attorney at Stillman Legal, P.C.

42 Broadway, Ste 12Th Floor, New York

New York, NY 10004

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cirilo Vera Lopez, Nabil Zerib. Mourad A Mourad served on 12/19/2019, answer due 1/9/2020. (Stillman, Lina) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#7

(#7) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

3 #1

Proposed Summons Proposed Summons Fateer Factory Inc.

#11

(#11) ORDER -- To ensure compliance with the requirements of both Mei Xing Yu v. Hasaki Rest., Inc., 2019 WL 6646618 (2d Cir. Dec. 6, 2019) and Cheeks v. Freeport Pancake House, Inc., 796 F.3d 199 (2d Cir. 2015), I respectfully direct the parties as follows. In the event any defendant makes an offer of judgment under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 68, the parties must promptly file, before filing any notice of acceptance of that offer, a notice that discloses all terms to which the parties have agreed (formally or otherwise, and regardless of whether the agreement is reduced to writing) that are not explicitly disclosed in the Rule 68 offer. The required notice must disclose all terms, including but not limited to the scope of any releases, any commitments regarding confidentiality or non-disparagement, and the apportionment of attorneys' fees. Any purported agreement that the parties fail to disclose in conformity with the foregoing requirements will be deemed void and unenforceable. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 12/17/2019. (Gutmann, Joseph) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cirilo Vera Lopez, Nabil Zerib. Feteer Factory Inc. served on 12/9/2019, answer due 12/30/2019. (Originally filed by: Stillman, Lina on 12/12/19) reentered on 1/7/2020 (Guy, Alicia). (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Feteer Factory Inc., Mourad A Mourad filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12069314 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Vera Lopez, Nabil Zerbib. (Stillman, Lina) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

#5

(#5) Civil Cover Sheet.. by Vera Lopez, Nabil Zerbib (Stillman, Lina) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

#9

(#9) Summons Issued as to Oga Boutros, Feteer Factory Inc., Mourad A Mourad. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

#4

(#4) AMENDED COMPLAINT To add Individual Defendant Oga Boutros and Correct Plaintiff's Name against Feteer Factory Inc., Mourad A Mourad, Oga Boutros, filed by Vera Lopez, Nabil Zerbib. (Stillman, Lina) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

#3

(#3) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by Vera Lopez, Nabil Zerbib (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons Fateer Factory Inc.) (Stillman, Lina) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

#8

(#8) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

#6

(#6) Proposed Summons. Re #4 Amended Complaint by Vera Lopez, Nabil Zerbib (Stillman, Lina) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

#13

(#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cirilo Vera Lopez, Nabil Zerib. Oga Boutros served on 12/19/2019, answer due 1/9/2020. (Stillman, Lina) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#2

(#2) Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint by Vera Lopez, Nabil Zerbib (Stillman, Lina) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cirilo Vera Lopez, Nabil Zerib. Oga Boutros served on 12/19/2019, answer due 1/9/2020. (Stillman, Lina) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cirilo Vera Lopez, Nabil Zerib. Mourad A Mourad served on 12/19/2019, answer due 1/9/2020. (Stillman, Lina) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Incorrect Case/Document/Entry Information re #10 SUMMONS Returned Executed electronically filed Lina Stillman, Esq. on 12/12/19 --- Because of plaintiffs' counsels selections while electronically filing the returned executed summons the docket entry text indicated that plaintiffs served plaintiffs. The Clerk has deleted and reentered the filing with the correct information, so no corrective action by plaintiffs' counsel is required. DO NOT REFILE your document. When filing documents on ECF it is imperative that counsel select the correct filing party, and if relevant, any other party. If you are unsure of the appropriate event you can contact the Clerk's Office for assistance. CM/ECF training is available at the courthouse free of charge. For more information regarding training, counsel can contact Evelyn Levine, Training Specialist, at (718) 613-2312. (Guy, Alicia) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER -- To ensure compliance with the requirements of both Mei Xing Yu v. Hasaki Rest., Inc., 2019 WL 6646618 (2d Cir. Dec. 6, 2019) and Cheeks v. Freeport Pancake House, Inc., 796 F.3d 199 (2d Cir. 2015), I respectfully direct the parties as follows. In the event any defendant makes an offer of judgment under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 68, the parties must promptly file, before filing any notice of acceptance of that offer, a notice that discloses all terms to which the parties have agreed (formally or otherwise, and regardless of whether the agreement is reduced to writing) that are not explicitly disclosed in the Rule 68 offer. The required notice must disclose all terms, including but not limited to the scope of any releases, any commitments regarding confidentiality or non-disparagement, and the apportionment of attorneys' fees. Any purported agreement that the parties fail to disclose in conformity with the foregoing requirements will be deemed void and unenforceable. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 12/17/2019. (Gutmann, Joseph) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cirilo Vera Lopez, Nabil Zerib. Feteer Factory Inc. served on 12/9/2019, answer due 12/30/2019. (Originally filed by: Stillman, Lina on 12/12/19) reentered on 1/7/2020 (Guy, Alicia). (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Summons Issued as to Oga Boutros, Feteer Factory Inc., Mourad A Mourad. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • Case Assigned to Judge Margo K. Brodie and Magistrate Judge James Orenstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Proposed Summons. Re #4 Amended Complaint by Vera Lopez, Nabil Zerbib (Stillman, Lina) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Civil Cover Sheet.. by Vera Lopez, Nabil Zerbib (Stillman, Lina) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AMENDED COMPLAINT To add Individual Defendant Oga Boutros and Correct Plaintiff's Name against Feteer Factory Inc., Mourad A Mourad, Oga Boutros, filed by Vera Lopez, Nabil Zerbib. (Stillman, Lina) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. Please resubmit Completed (Plaintiff and Defendants Information Section) Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by Vera Lopez, Nabil Zerbib (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons Fateer Factory Inc.) (Stillman, Lina) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint by Vera Lopez, Nabil Zerbib (Stillman, Lina) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Feteer Factory Inc., Mourad A Mourad filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12069314 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Vera Lopez, Nabil Zerbib. (Stillman, Lina) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.