This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/29/2022 at 07:13:08 (UTC).

Lopez et al v. Griswold et al

Case Summary

On 01/28/2022 Lopez filed a Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality lawsuit against Griswold. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are S. Kato Crews and John L. Kane. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00247

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

S. Kato Crews

John L. Kane

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Greg Lopez

Rodney Pelton

Steven House

Defendants

Jena Griswold

Judd Choate

Amicus Curiae

Colorado Common Cause

Common Cause

Campaign Legal Center

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Daniel E. Burrows

Attorney at Advance Colorado

1312 17Th Street, Suite 2029

Denver, CO 80202

Owen Dennis Yeates

Attorney at Institute for Free Speech

1150 Connecticut Avenue Nw, Suite 801

Washington, DC 20036

Defendant Attorneys

Michael T. Kotlarczyk

Attorney at Colorado Attorney General's Office

1300 Broadway

Denver, CO 80203

Peter G. Baumann

Attorney at Colorado Attorney General's Office

1300 Broadway

Denver, CO 80203

Amicus Curiae Attorney

Martha M. Tierney

Attorney at Tierney Lawrence LLP

225 East 16Th Avenue, Suite 350

Denver, CO 80203

 

Court Documents

#29

(#29) USCA Case Number 22-1082 for #27 Notice of Appeal filed by Steven House, Rodney Pelton, Greg Lopez. (trvo, ) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

28 #1

Preliminary Record and Docket Sheet

28 #28

Main Document

#27

(#27) NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #26 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs Steven House, Greg Lopez, Rodney Pelton (Filing fee $ 505, Receipt Number ACODC-8368701) (Yeates, Owen) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

#26

(#26) Memorandum and Opinion & Order on Motion For Preliminary Injunction. For the reasons provided in this Order, Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction (ECF No. #8 ) is DENIED. ORDERED by Judge John L. Kane on 3/10/2022.(angar, ) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

#25

(#25) MINUTE ENTRY for In Court Hearing - PI Day-2 proceedings held before Judge John L. Kane on 3/10/2022. Taking under advisement #8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Court Reporter: Mary George. (babia) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

#24

(#24) MINUTE ENTRY for In Court Hearing - PI, day-1 proceedings held before Judge John L. Kane on 3/9/2022. ORDERED: Todays hearing shall continue tomorrow morning at 9:00 a.m. Court Reporter: Mary George. (babia) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

#22

(#22) Unopposed MOTION to Continue Preliminary Injunction Hearing or Decide Motion on Briefs by Plaintiffs Steven House, Greg Lopez, Rodney Pelton. (Burrows, Daniel) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

#21

(#21) REPLY to Response to #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , responding to Defendants' Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction (ECF No. 14), and in support of Plaintiffs' Motion (ECF No. 8), filed by Plaintiffs Steven House, Greg Lopez, Rodney Pelton. (Yeates, Owen) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

8 #11

Exhibit Durango Airbnb Search

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Owen Dennis Yeates on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Owen Dennis Yeates added to party Steven House(pty:pla), Attorney Owen Dennis Yeates added to party Greg Lopez(pty:pla), Attorney Owen Dennis Yeates added to party Rodney Pelton(pty:pla) (Yeates, Owen) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

3 #2

Magistrate Judge Consent Form

3 #1

Summons

3 #3

Main Document

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) USCA Case Number 22-1082 for #27 Notice of Appeal filed by Steven House, Rodney Pelton, Greg Lopez. (trvo, ) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) LETTER Transmitting Notice of Appeal to all counsel advising of the transmittal of the #27 Notice of Appeal filed by Steven House, Rodney Pelton, Greg Lopez to the U.S. Court of Appeals. ( Retained Counsel, Fee paid,) (Attachments: #1 Preliminary Record and Docket Sheet)(angar, ) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #26 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs Steven House, Greg Lopez, Rodney Pelton (Filing fee $ 505, Receipt Number ACODC-8368701) (Yeates, Owen) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Memorandum and Opinion & Order on Motion For Preliminary Injunction. For the reasons provided in this Order, Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction (ECF No. #8 ) is DENIED. ORDERED by Judge John L. Kane on 3/10/2022.(angar, ) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) MINUTE ENTRY for In Court Hearing - PI Day-2 proceedings held before Judge John L. Kane on 3/10/2022. Taking under advisement #8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Court Reporter: Mary George. (babia) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) MINUTE ENTRY for In Court Hearing - PI, day-1 proceedings held before Judge John L. Kane on 3/9/2022. ORDERED: Todays hearing shall continue tomorrow morning at 9:00 a.m. Court Reporter: Mary George. (babia) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER granting #22 Unopposed Motion to Reschedule Preliminary Injunction Hearing or Decide Motion on Briefs. The Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for Thursday, March 3, 2022, at 10:00 AM before Judge John L. Kane is VACATED AND RESET TO WEDNESDAY, MARCH 9, 2022, AT 10:00 AM in Courtroom A802, Alfred A. Arraj U.S. Courthouse, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. Out-of-state counsel may appear via video teleconference, but at least one attorney representing each party must be physically present in the courtroom. Counsel wishing to appear remotely shall email kane_chambers@cod.uscourts.gov for further instructions. Parties, counsel, and others in attendance must abide by all additional protocols relating to the COVID-19 pandemic. Those protocols can be found on the District Court website, www.cod.uscourts.gov. Individuals who wish to monitor the hearing via the public access line are directed to call the Court's conference line as a participant Toll Free: 877-336-1831, Access Code 6747227#, five minutes before the scheduled time. Ordered by Judge John L. Kane on 2/28/2022. Text Only Entry(jlksec) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Unopposed MOTION to Continue Preliminary Injunction Hearing or Decide Motion on Briefs by Plaintiffs Steven House, Greg Lopez, Rodney Pelton. (Burrows, Daniel) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) REPLY to Response to #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , responding to Defendants' Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction (ECF No. 14), and in support of Plaintiffs' Motion (ECF No. 8), filed by Plaintiffs Steven House, Greg Lopez, Rodney Pelton. (Yeates, Owen) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Exhibit List for Preliminary Injunction Hearing by Plaintiffs Steven House, Greg Lopez, Rodney Pelton. (Burrows, Daniel) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 02/08/2022 re: #8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Defendants shall respond to #8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction on or before February 17, 2022. Text Only Entry (pabsec, ) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CASE REASSIGNED. Pursuant to the filing of #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . This case is randomly reassigned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. All future pleadings should be designated as 22-cv-00247-PAB. (Text Only Entry) (csarr, ) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs Steven House, Greg Lopez, Rodney Pelton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Lopez Decl., #2 Exhibit Pelton Decl., #3 Exhibit House Decl., #4 Exhibit Ganahl Sept. Candidate Aff., #5 Exhibit Ganahl Jan. Candidate Aff., #6 Exhibit Ganahl Excess Contributions, #7 Exhibit Polis Financial Summ., #8 Exhibit Taheri Decl., #9 Exhibit Masket Decl., #10 Exhibit Candidate Financial Summaries, #11 Exhibit Durango Airbnb Search, #12 Exhibit Party-to-Candidate Contributions 2019-20, #13 Exhibit Colo. Dem Party Neutrality Policy, #14 Exhibit Colo. GOP Bylaws, #15 Exhibit 2002 Blue Book Extracts)(Burrows, Daniel) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Owen Dennis Yeates on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Owen Dennis Yeates added to party Steven House(pty:pla), Attorney Owen Dennis Yeates added to party Greg Lopez(pty:pla), Attorney Owen Dennis Yeates added to party Rodney Pelton(pty:pla) (Yeates, Owen) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Greg Lopez, Steven House, Rodney Pelton. Judd Choate waiver sent on 1/29/2022, answer due 3/30/2022; Jena Griswold waiver sent on 1/29/2022, answer due 3/30/2022. (Burrows, Daniel) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Peter G. Baumann on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Peter G. Baumann added to party Judd Choate(pty:dft), Attorney Peter G. Baumann added to party Jena Griswold(pty:dft) (Baumann, Peter) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael T. Kotlarczyk on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Michael T. Kotlarczyk added to party Judd Choate(pty:dft), Attorney Michael T. Kotlarczyk added to party Jena Griswold(pty:dft) (Kotlarczyk, Michael) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jcharl, ) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews Text Only Entry. (jcharl, ) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Judd Choate, Jena Griswold (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8289144)Attorney Daniel E. Burrows added to party Steven House(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel E. Burrows added to party Greg Lopez(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel E. Burrows added to party Rodney Pelton(pty:pla), filed by Greg Lopez, Steven House, Rodney Pelton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Burrows, Daniel) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Campaign Legal Center and Common Cause Maryland is a litigant