This case was last updated from PACER on 08/27/2019 at 07:04:03 (UTC).

Lopez v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the pooling and servicing agreement dated as of May 1, 2005 Park Place Securities, Inc., Asset-Backed Pass-Through certificates series 2005-WHQ3

Case Summary

On 06/28/2019 Lopez filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Wells Fargo Bank, N A as Trustee for the pooling and servicing agreement dated as of May 1, 2005 Park Place Securities, Inc , Asset-Backed Pass-Through certificates series 2005-WHQ3. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Joanna Seybert and Steven I. Locke. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-03795

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joanna Seybert

Referral Judge

Steven I. Locke

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the pooling and servicing agreement dated as of May 1, 2005 Park Place Securities, Inc., Asset-Backed Pass-Through certificates series 2005-WHQ3

1100 Town & Country Road, Suite 1100

Orange, CA 92868

Guillermo Lopez

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Raymond D. Marquez

Attorney at R. David Marquez, P.C.

170 Old Country Road, Suite 505

Mineola, NY 11501

Defendant Attorney

Fernando Carlos Rivera-Maissonet

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP

800 Third Avenue, 13Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the pooling and servicing agreement dated as of May 1, 2005 Park Place Securities, Inc., Asset-Backed Pass-Through certificates series 2005-WHQ3. (Rivera-Maissonet, Fernando) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

#7

(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the pooling and servicing agreement dated as of May 1, 2005 Park Place Securities, Inc., Asset-Backed Pass-Through certificates series 2005-WHQ3 identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the pooling and servicing agreement dated as of May 1, 2005 Park Place Securities, Inc., Asset-Backed Pass-Through certificates series 2005-WHQ3. (Rivera-Maissonet, Fernando) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Fernando Carlos Rivera-Maissonet on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the pooling and servicing agreement dated as of May 1, 2005 Park Place Securities, Inc., Asset-Backed Pass-Through certificates series 2005-WHQ3 (aty to be noticed) (Rivera-Maissonet, Fernando) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Guillermo Lopez. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the pooling and servicing agreement dated as of May 1, 2005 Park Place Securities, Inc., Asset-Backed Pass-Through certificates series 2005-WHQ3 served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019. (Marquez, Raymond) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the pooling and servicing agreement dated as of May 1, 2005 Park Place Securities, Inc., Asset-Backed Pass-Through certificates series 2005-WHQ3. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

#3

(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

#2

(#2) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibits A-H

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the pooling and servicing agreement dated as of May 1, 2005 Park Place Securities, Inc., Asset-Backed Pass-Through certificates series 2005-WHQ3 filing fee $400, receipt number BNYEDC-11621462, Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes, filed by Guillermo Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Exhibits A-H) (Marquez, Raymond) Modified on 7/1/2019 (Rodin, Deanna). (Entered: 06/28/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Electronic ORDER granting DE #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Without opposition, the deadline for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to and including 9/16/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 8/15/2019. (Kantor, Jesse) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the pooling and servicing agreement dated as of May 1, 2005 Park Place Securities, Inc., Asset-Backed Pass-Through certificates series 2005-WHQ3. (Rivera-Maissonet, Fernando) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the pooling and servicing agreement dated as of May 1, 2005 Park Place Securities, Inc., Asset-Backed Pass-Through certificates series 2005-WHQ3 identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the pooling and servicing agreement dated as of May 1, 2005 Park Place Securities, Inc., Asset-Backed Pass-Through certificates series 2005-WHQ3. (Rivera-Maissonet, Fernando) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Fernando Carlos Rivera-Maissonet on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the pooling and servicing agreement dated as of May 1, 2005 Park Place Securities, Inc., Asset-Backed Pass-Through certificates series 2005-WHQ3 (aty to be noticed) (Rivera-Maissonet, Fernando) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Guillermo Lopez. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the pooling and servicing agreement dated as of May 1, 2005 Park Place Securities, Inc., Asset-Backed Pass-Through certificates series 2005-WHQ3 served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019. (Marquez, Raymond) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the pooling and servicing agreement dated as of May 1, 2005 Park Place Securities, Inc., Asset-Backed Pass-Through certificates series 2005-WHQ3. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • Case Assigned to Judge Joanna Seybert and Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the pooling and servicing agreement dated as of May 1, 2005 Park Place Securities, Inc., Asset-Backed Pass-Through certificates series 2005-WHQ3 filing fee $400, receipt number BNYEDC-11621462, Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes, filed by Guillermo Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Exhibits A-H) (Marquez, Raymond) Modified on 7/1/2019 (Rodin, Deanna). (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less