This case was last updated from PACER on 01/16/2021 at 07:47:15 (UTC).

Lopes v. Reddit, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/17/2020 Lopes filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against Reddit, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Nathanael M. Cousins. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-08086

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nathanael M. Cousins

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cornelius Lopes

Newark, CA 94560

Defendants

Erin Baldassari

Ryan Thompson

First Media

San Jose Mercury News

Bay Area News Group

Reddit, Inc.

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Cornelius Lopes. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2020) (Entered: 11/27/2020)

#4

(#4) CLERK'S NOTICE RE: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff is requested to file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 12/2/2020. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Erin Baldassari, San Jose Mercury News, Ryan Thompson. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2020) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

#2

(#2) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/10/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/17/2021 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Receipt

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Erin Baldassari, Bay Area News Group, First Media, Reddit, Inc., San Jose Mercury News, Ryan Thompson (Filing fee $ 400-Paid). Filed by Cornelius Lopes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Receipt, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2020) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Cornelius Lopes. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2020) (Entered: 11/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CLERK'S NOTICE RE: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff is requested to file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 12/2/2020. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Erin Baldassari, San Jose Mercury News, Ryan Thompson. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2020) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/10/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/17/2021 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Erin Baldassari, Bay Area News Group, First Media, Reddit, Inc., San Jose Mercury News, Ryan Thompson (Filing fee $ 400-Paid). Filed by Cornelius Lopes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Receipt, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2020) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bay Area News Group is a litigant

Latest cases where REDDIT INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant