This case was last updated from PACER on 01/18/2020 at 07:27:01 (UTC).

Longwell Textiles LTD. v. Matrix International Textile Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/19/2019 Longwell Textiles LTD filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Matrix International Textile Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Stephen V. Wilson and Alicia G. Rosenberg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-09904

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stephen V. Wilson

Referral Judge

Alicia G. Rosenberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LONGWELL TEXTILES LTD

Longwell Textiles LTD.

Defendants

Matrix International Textile Inc.

NEMAN PROPERTIES LLC

Does 1 through 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Benedict Yung Hur

Attorney at Willkie Farr and Gallagher LLP

One Front Street 34Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Jayvan E Mitchell

Attorney at Willkie Farr and Gallagher LLP

One Front Street 34Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #2

Exhibit 2

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Stephen V. Wilson for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-09904 SVW(AGRx). (rn) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs, (Hur, Benedict) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (ghap) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Neman Properties LLC. (ghap) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Matrix International Textile Inc. (ghap) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (ghap) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Summons Request #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by PLAINTIFF LONGWELL TEXTILES LTD. (Hur, Benedict) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by PLAINTIFF LONGWELL TEXTILES LTD. (Hur, Benedict) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff LONGWELL TEXTILES LTD. (Hur, Benedict) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24810206 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff LONGWELL TEXTILES LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Attorney Benedict Yung Hur added to party LONGWELL TEXTILES LTD(pty:pla))(Hur, Benedict) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MATRIX INTERNATIONAL TEXTILES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Benedict Y Hur