This case was last updated from PACER on 09/15/2020 at 09:43:21 (UTC).

Longoria v. Saul

Case Summary

On 07/17/2020 Longoria filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Saul. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Charles Eskridge. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-02546

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles Eskridge

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Theresa A Longoria

Defendants

Andrew Saul

William Pelham Barr

Ryan K. Patrick

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James Foster Andrews

Attorney at The Law Office of James F. Andrews

709 Studewood

Houston, TX 77007

 

Court Documents

#1

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketSummons Not Issued as to William Pelham Barr Due to these deficiencies: Error in address. Missing address number. Attorney or Plaintiff notified of deficiencies by NEF, filed.(JacquelineMata, 4) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul and U.S. Attorney. Issued summons returned to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(JacquelineMata, 4) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement, #3 Supplement)(Andrews, James) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketSummons Not Issued as to Andrew Saul as no proposed summons received. Attorney for Plaintiff notified of deficiencies by NEF, filed.(jdav, 4) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul filed by Theresa A Longoria. (Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis granted by the Honorable Andrew S. Hanen 7/17/2020)(jdav, 4) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less