This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/18/2021 at 09:46:28 (UTC).

Longhorn HD LLC. v. Juniper Networks, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/19/2021 Longhorn HD LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Juniper Networks, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Rodney Gilstrap. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00099

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Longhorn HD LLC.

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Juniper Networks, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Alfred Ross Fabricant

John Andrew Rubino

Peter Lambrianakos

Vincent J Rubino, III

Justin Kurt Truelove

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Alan Michael Fisch

Jeffrey M. Saltman

Adam Auchter Allgood

R. William Sigler

 

Court Documents

#20

#19

18 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#18

#17

16 #5

Exhibit 4 - February 2020 Letter

#16

12 #1

Exhibit A - 2020-02-13 Letter

#12

#3

#2

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit E U.S. Patent No. 7,343,421

1 #4

Exhibit D U.S. Patent No. 7,260,846

1 #3

Exhibit C U.S. Patent No. 6,954,790

1 #2

Exhibit B U.S. Patent No. 6,643,778

1 #1

Exhibit A U.S. Patent No. 6,421,732

#1

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) RESPONSE to #12 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Longhorn HD LLC.. (Rubino, Vincent) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER granting #18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/3/2021. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California by Longhorn HD LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubino, Vincent) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Justin Kurt Truelove on behalf of Longhorn HD LLC. (Truelove, Justin) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION to Change Venue by Juniper Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of David Saunders, #2 Exhibit 1 - Street View of 203 E Travis Street, #3 Exhibit 2 - Noble Wealth Advisors Website & Facebook Page, #4 Exhibit 3 - Certificate of Formation, #5 Exhibit 4 - February 2020 Letter, #6 Exhibit 5 - Inventor Information, #7 Exhibit 6 - Patent Assignment Abstracts, #8 Exhibit 7 - Inventors' LinkedIn Pages (Highlighted), #9 Exhibit 8 - Prosecutors' LinkedIn Pages (Highlighted), #10 Text of Proposed Order)(Fisch, Alan) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey M. Saltman on behalf of Juniper Networks, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8365387. (Saltman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by R. William Sigler on behalf of Juniper Networks, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8365352. (Sigler, R.) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Juniper Networks, Inc. (Fisch, Alan) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Longhorn HD LLC. by Juniper Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2020-02-13 Letter)(Fisch, Alan) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Issued as to Juniper Networks, Inc.. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Andrew Rubino on behalf of Longhorn HD LLC. (Rubino, John) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter Lambrianakos on behalf of Longhorn HD LLC. (Lambrianakos, Peter) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alfred Ross Fabricant on behalf of Longhorn HD LLC. (Fabricant, Alfred) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Vincent J Rubino, III on behalf of Longhorn HD LLC. (Rubino, Vincent) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Longhorn HD LLC. identifying Corporate Parent Alpha Alpha Intellectual Partners LLC for Longhorn HD LLC.. (Rubino, Vincent) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Rubino, Vincent) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Juniper Networks, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8308036.), filed by Longhorn HD LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A U.S. Patent No. 6,421,732, #2 Exhibit B U.S. Patent No. 6,643,778, #3 Exhibit C U.S. Patent No. 6,954,790, #4 Exhibit D U.S. Patent No. 7,260,846, #5 Exhibit E U.S. Patent No. 7,343,421, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rubino, Vincent) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less