This case was last updated from PACER on 06/01/2021 at 09:07:27 (UTC).

Longhorn HD LLC. v. Best Buy Co., Inc.

Case Summary

On April 2, 2021, Longhorn HD LLC. (“LHD” or “Plaintiff”), represented by Alfred Ross Fabricant, Peter Lambrianakos and Vincent J. Rubino, III of Fabricant LLP, and John Andrew Rubino of Rubino Law LLC, filed an intellectual property lawsuit against Best Buy Co., Inc. (“Best Buy” or “Defendant”), seeking permanent injunctive relief and damages among other reliefs, for alleged unlawful infringement of United States patents owned by Plaintiff. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Texas with Judge Rodney Gilstrap presiding. 

 

The Plaintiff filed this complaint for the alleged infringement of U.S. Patent No. 6,237,112 (the “’112 Patent”) entitled “SCSI Device Available for Breakdown Prediction and Self-Examination and a Method Thereof”, U.S. Patent No. 6,734,597 (the “’597 Patent”) entitled “Thermomechanical In-Plane Microactuator.”, U.S. Patent No. 6,938,104 (the “’104 Patent”) entitled “Removable Hard Drive Assembly, Computer with a Removable Hard Disk Drive, Method of Initializing and Operating a Removable Hard Drive.”, U.S. Patent No. 8,015,444 (the “’444 Patent”) entitled “Protection of Non-Volatile Memory Component Against Data Corruption Due to Physical Shock.” (collectively, the “Patents-in-Suit”) which generally cover systems and methods for use in computer and server storage and structure owned by them.

 

The Plaintiff alleged that “Best Buy has infringed and is continuing to infringe one or more of the Patents-in-Suit by making, using, selling, offering to sell, and/or importing, and by actively inducing others to make, use, sell, offer to sell, and/or import, products including computers, and servers that utilize hard disk drives (“HDDs”), solid-state drives (“SSDs”), and associated software that infringes the Patents-in-Suit. Best Buy has also infringed and is continuing to infringe one or more of the Patents-in-Suit by making, using, selling, offering to sell, and/or importing, and by actively inducing others to make, use, sell, offer to sell, and/or import, products including servers that utilize 1U mateable servers and/or hot-swappable drive technology and associated software that infringes the Patents-in-Suit.”

 

Furthermore, the Plaintiff alleged that upon information and belief that “Defendant induced infringement by others, including end-users, with the intent to cause infringing acts by others or, in the alternative, with the belief that there was a high probability that others, including end-users, infringe the Patents-in-suit but while remaining willfully blind to the infringement.”

 

In the four claims for relief laid down by the Plaintiff, infringement of Patents-in-suit in violation of 35 U.S.C. § 271 has been alleged, wherein it has been alleged that Defendant has and continues to indirectly infringe Patents-in-Suit by knowingly and intentionally inducing others, including Oracle customers and end-users, to directly infringe, either literally or under the doctrine of equivalents, by making, using, offering to sell, selling, and/or importing into the United States products that include infringing technology.

 

In prayer for relief, the plaintiff has requested the court to declare that Defendant has infringed the patent in suit, and permanently enjoin Defendant from further acts of infringement of one or more of the asserted patents; and to order awarding damages sufficient to compensate but in no event less than a reasonable royalty, together with interest and costs; declaring that this case is exceptional and awarding LHD its costs and reasonable attorney fees under 35 U.S.C. § 285.

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.





Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00122

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Longhorn HD LLC.

Defendant

Best Buy Co., Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alfred Ross Fabricant

Attorney at Fabricant LLP - NY

230 Park Avenue, 3Rd Floor W.

New York, NY 10169

John Andrew Rubino

Attorney at Rubino Law LLC

830 Morris Turnpike

Short Hills, NJ 07078

Peter Lambrianakos

Attorney at Fabricant LLP - NY

230 Park Avenue, 3Rd Floor W.

New York, NY 10169

Vincent J Rubino, III

Attorney at Fabricant LLP - NY

230 Park Avenue, 3Rd Floor W.

New York, NY 10169

Justin Kurt Truelove

Attorney at Truelove Law Firm

207 N Wellington, P O Box 1409

Marshall, TX 75671

Defendant Attorney

Melissa Richards Smith

Attorney at Gillam & Smith, LLP

303 South Washington Avenue

Marshall, TX 75670

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

2 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Richards Smith on behalf of Best Buy Co., Inc. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Best Buy Co., Inc.. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Longhorn HD LLC.. Best Buy Co., Inc. served on 4/6/2021, answer due 4/27/2021. (Rubino, Vincent) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Justin Kurt Truelove on behalf of Longhorn HD LLC. (Truelove, Justin) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Issued as to Best Buy Co., Inc.. (nkl, ) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, ) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (nkl, ) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Andrew Rubino on behalf of Longhorn HD LLC. (Rubino, John) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter Lambrianakos on behalf of Longhorn HD LLC. (Lambrianakos, Peter) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alfred Ross Fabricant on behalf of Longhorn HD LLC. (Fabricant, Alfred) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Vincent J Rubino, III on behalf of Longhorn HD LLC. (Rubino, Vincent) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Longhorn HD LLC. identifying Corporate Parent Alpha Alpha Intellectual Partners LLC for Longhorn HD LLC.. (Rubino, Vincent) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Rubino, Vincent) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Best Buy Co., Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8335053.), filed by Longhorn HD LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rubino, Vincent) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Longhorn HD LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Best Buy Co. Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Melissa Richards Smith