This case was last updated from PACER on 05/30/2021 at 09:38:31 (UTC).

Longhorn HD LLC. v. Atos SE.

Case Summary

On 03/31/2021 Longhorn HD LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Atos SE. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Rodney Gilstrap and Roy S. Payne. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00115

  • Filing Date:

    03/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

Referral Judge

Roy S. Payne

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Longhorn HD LLC.

Defendant

Atos SE.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alfred Ross Fabricant

Attorney at Fabricant LLP - NY

230 Park Avenue, 3Rd Floor W.

New York, NY 10169

John Andrew Rubino

Attorney at Rubino Law LLC

830 Morris Turnpike

Short Hills, NJ 07078

Peter Lambrianakos

Attorney at Fabricant LLP - NY

230 Park Avenue, 3Rd Floor W.

New York, NY 10169

Vincent J Rubino, III

Attorney at Fabricant LLP - NY

230 Park Avenue, 3Rd Floor W.

New York, NY 10169

Justin Kurt Truelove

Attorney at Truelove Law Firm

207 N Wellington, P O Box 1409

Marshall, TX 75671

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Justin Kurt Truelove on behalf of Longhorn HD LLC. (Truelove, Justin) Modified on 4/1/2021 (ch, ). Modified on 4/5/2021 (ch, ). (Entered: 04/01/2021)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Issued as to Atos SE.. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Andrew Rubino on behalf of Longhorn HD LLC. (Rubino, John) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter Lambrianakos on behalf of Longhorn HD LLC. (Lambrianakos, Peter) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alfred Ross Fabricant on behalf of Longhorn HD LLC. (Fabricant, Alfred) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Vincent J Rubino, III on behalf of Longhorn HD LLC. (Rubino, Vincent) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Longhorn HD LLC. identifying Corporate Parent Alpha Alpha Intellectual Partners LLC for Longhorn HD LLC.. (Rubino, Vincent) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Rubino, Vincent) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Atos SE. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8330913.), filed by Longhorn HD LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rubino, Vincent) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Justin Kurt Truelove on behalf of Longhorn HD LLC. (Truelove, Justin) Modified on 4/1/2021 (ch, ). Modified on 4/5/2021 (ch, ). (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Issued as to Atos SE.. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Andrew Rubino on behalf of Longhorn HD LLC. (Rubino, John) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter Lambrianakos on behalf of Longhorn HD LLC. (Lambrianakos, Peter) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alfred Ross Fabricant on behalf of Longhorn HD LLC. (Fabricant, Alfred) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Vincent J Rubino, III on behalf of Longhorn HD LLC. (Rubino, Vincent) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Longhorn HD LLC. identifying Corporate Parent Alpha Alpha Intellectual Partners LLC for Longhorn HD LLC.. (Rubino, Vincent) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Rubino, Vincent) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Atos SE. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8330913.), filed by Longhorn HD LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rubino, Vincent) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Longhorn HD LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Andrew Rubino

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Peter Lambrianakos