This case was last updated from PACER on 07/02/2021 at 07:50:40 (UTC).

Longen v. Tiebsar et al

Case Summary

On 05/03/2021 Longen filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Tiebsar. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Eric C. Tostrud and Hildy Bowbeer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:21-CV-01142

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    Minnesota District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Eric C. Tostrud

Referral Judge

Hildy Bowbeer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ira E. Longen

Defendants

Dan Tiebsar

Werner Co.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael B Healey

Attorney at Wagner Falconer & Judd. Ltd.

100 South 5Th Street, Suite 800

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Defendant Attorneys

Lance D Meyer

Attorney at O'Meara Leer Wagner & Kohl, PA

7401 Metro Blvd Ste 600

Minneapolis, MN 55439-3034

Dale O. Thornsjo

Attorney at O'Meara Leer Wagner & Kohl, PA

7401 Metro Blvd Ste 600

Minneapolis, MN 55439-3034

 

Court Documents

8 #1

Consent Form

#8

(#8) ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/29/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 7/6/2021 at 02:00 PM by Telephone Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 6/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(LNP) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Werner Co. re #6 Answer to Complaint and Additional Defenses, and Jury Trial Demand (Thornsjo, Dale) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint and Additional Defenses, and Jury Trial Demand filed by Werner Co.. (Thornsjo, Dale) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Werner Co. re #1 Notice of Removal, #3 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement (Thornsjo, Dale) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

#3

(#3) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant Werner Co.. (Thornsjo, Dale) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit(s) Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal

1 #1

Exhibit(s) Summons and Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Dakota County District Court, case number (to be determined) (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8721328) filed by Werner Co.. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit(s) Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Thornsjo, Dale) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2021
  • Docket(#10) TEXT ONLY ORDER - TIME CHANGE: Due to a change in the Court's calendar, the starting time of the Pretrial Conference, currently set for 2:45 PM on 7/22/2021, is being changed. The Status Conference will now be conducted by the undersigned at 2:15 PM on 7/22/2021 by Conference Bridge. The parties shall submit their Rule 26(f) Report and confidential settlement position letters on or before July 15, 2021. Call-in instructions will be provided a few days prior to the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 6/28/2021.(LNP) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • Docket(#9) TEXT ONLY ORDER: Due to a change in the Court's calendar, the Pretrial Conference, currently set for 7/6/2021 at 2:00 PM Central Time, is being rescheduled. The Pretrial Conference will now be conducted by the undersigned on 7/22/2021 at 2:45 PM Central Time by Conference Bridge. The parties shall submit their Rule 26(f) Report and confidential settlement position letters on or before July 15, 2021. Chambers will provide call-in instructions a few day prior to the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 6/7/2021.(LNP) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/29/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 7/6/2021 at 02:00 PM by Telephone Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 6/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(LNP) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Werner Co. re #6 Answer to Complaint and Additional Defenses, and Jury Trial Demand (Thornsjo, Dale) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint and Additional Defenses, and Jury Trial Demand filed by Werner Co.. (Thornsjo, Dale) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • Docket(#5) (Text-Only) NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (LNP) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Werner Co. re #1 Notice of Removal, #3 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement (Thornsjo, Dale) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant Werner Co.. (Thornsjo, Dale) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • Docket(#2) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 21-cv-1142 (ECT/HB). (lmb) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Dakota County District Court, case number (to be determined) (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8721328) filed by Werner Co.. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit(s) Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Thornsjo, Dale) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Werner Co (DE) is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lance D Meyer

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dale O Thornsjo