This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/31/2021 at 08:21:46 (UTC).

Longbeam Technologies LLC v. Amazon.com, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On November 1, 2021, Longbeam Technologies LLC (“Plaintiff” or “Longbeam”), represented by Richard Charles Weinblatt and Stamatios Stamoulis of Stamoulis & Weinblatt LLC, filed an intellectual property lawsuit against Amazon.com, Inc. (“Amazon”) and Amazon Web Services, Inc. (“AWS Inc.”) (collectively, “Amazon” or “Defendants”), seeking declaratory reliefs and damages along with prejudgement and post-judgement interests among other reliefs for the alleged infringement of the United States Patents owned by the Plaintiff. This case was filed in the United States District Court in the District of Delaware. 

 

The Plaintiff filed this complaint for the alleged infringement of United States Patent No. 7,512,989 (“the ’989 Patent”), United States Patent No. 7,660,418 (“the ’418 Patent”), United States Patent No. 8,472,627 (“the ’627 Patent”), and United States Patent No. 10,715,316 (“the ’316 Patent”) (collectively, the “patents-in-suit”) owned by the Plaintiff.

 

In the complaint, the Plaintiff alleged that, “Defendants directly infringe (literally and/or under the doctrine of equivalents) the ’989 Patent by using the method covered by at least claim 31 of the ’989 Patent” and “Defendants’ instrumentality that infringes one or more claims of the ’989 patent includes, but is not limited to, Amazon Web Services (“AWS”), and any other of Defendants’ networks, systems, devices, and/or services that practice a method for communicating data to a recipient device as claimed by the ’989 Patent.”

 

The Plaintiff further alleged that, “On information and belief, AWS provides on-demand cloud computing platforms and APIs to individuals, companies, and governments on a metered pay-as-you-go basis. AWS provides Amazon Key Management Service (KMS) to communicate data in a protected way through encryption/decryption mechanism. Amazon KMS gives a user a centralized control over cryptographic keys used to protect the data.” 

 

The Plaintiff additionally alleged that, “Plaintiff has been damaged by the direct infringement of Defendants and is suffering and will continue to suffer irreparable harm and damages as a result of this infringement.”

 

Similar allegations have been made by the Plaintiff with reference to the alleged infringement of other Patents-in-suit. 

 

There are four claims for relief laid down by the Plaintiff, one for the alleged infringement of each of the Patents-in-suit.

 

In the prayer for relief, the Plaintiff has requested the Court for declaratory relief that the Defendants directly infringe one or more claims of the Patents-in-Suit and for an award to the Plaintiff for damages under 35 U.S.C. § 284, or otherwise permitted by law, including supplemental damages for any continued post-verdict infringement along with pre-judgment and post-judgment interest on the damages award and costs, cost of this action (including all disbursements) and attorney fees pursuant to 35 U.S.C § 285, and any other costs and further relief the Court determines to be just and reasonable. 

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.



Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01559

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colm F. Connolly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Longbeam Technologies LLC

Defendants

Amazon.com, Inc.

Amazon Web Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stamatios Stamoulis

Attorney at Stamoulis & Weinblatt LLC

800 N. West Street, Third Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Richard Charles Weinblatt

Attorney at Stamoulis & Weinblatt LLC

800 N. West Street, Third Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Defendant Attorney

Jeremy A. Tigan

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

1201 North Market Streetp.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Amazon Web Services, Inc. and Amazon.com, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3734383.) - filed by Longbeam Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(srs) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (srs) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

#3

(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 7,512,989 B2 ;US 7,660,418 B2 ;US 8,472.672 B2 ;US 10,715,316 B2. (srs) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

#4

(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Longbeam Technologies LLC. (srs) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Amazon.com, Inc. on 11/1/2021. (srs) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Amazon Web Services, Inc. on 11/1/2021. (srs) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Longbeam Technologies LLC. Amazon.com, Inc. served on 11/3/2021, answer due 11/24/2021. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Longbeam Technologies LLC. Amazon Web Services, Inc. served on 11/3/2021, answer due 11/24/2021. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

#9

(#9) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to January 24, 2022 - filed by Amazon Web Services, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc.. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 11/11/2021)

#10

(#10) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Maximilian A. Grant, Adam M. Greenfield, Gabriel K. Bell, David A. Zucker, and Kimberly Q. Li - filed by Amazon Web Services, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc.. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

4 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Maximilian A. Grant, Adam M. Greenfield, Gabriel K. Bell, David A. Zucker, and Kimberly Q. Li, filed by Amazon Web Services, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 11/17/2021. (kmd) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Maximilian A. Grant, Adam M. Greenfield, Gabriel K. Bell, David A. Zucker, and Kimberly Q. Li - filed by Amazon Web Services, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc.. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to January 24, 2022, filed by Amazon Web Services, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Amazon Web Services, Inc. answer due 1/24/2022; Amazon.com, Inc. answer due 1/24/2022. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 11/12/2021. (kmd) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to January 24, 2022 - filed by Amazon Web Services, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc.. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 11/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Longbeam Technologies LLC. Amazon Web Services, Inc. served on 11/3/2021, answer due 11/24/2021. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Longbeam Technologies LLC. Amazon.com, Inc. served on 11/3/2021, answer due 11/24/2021. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (nms) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Amazon Web Services, Inc. on 11/1/2021. (srs) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Amazon.com, Inc. on 11/1/2021. (srs) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Longbeam Technologies LLC. (srs) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 7,512,989 B2 ;US 7,660,418 B2 ;US 8,472.672 B2 ;US 10,715,316 B2. (srs) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (srs) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Amazon Web Services, Inc. and Amazon.com, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3734383.) - filed by Longbeam Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(srs) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Amazon Web Services Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Amazon.Com, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeremy A. Tigan