This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/21/2022 at 08:19:39 (UTC).

Long v. Walmart Claims Services Inc et al

Case Summary

On 01/20/2022 Long filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against Walmart Claims Services Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Staci G Cornelius. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00080

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Staci G Cornelius

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Vincent Long

Defendants

Walmart Claims Services Inc

Walmart Inc

Walmart Neighborhood Stores

WalMart Stores East LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Johnathan Fitzgerald Austin

Attorney at AUSTIN LAW, PC

Po Box 321173

Birmingham, AL 35212

Richard Allan Rice

Attorney at THE RICE LAW FIRM LLC

420 20Th Street North Suite 2000, Po Box 453

Birmingham, AL 35201

Defendant Attorneys

Julie Davis Pearce

Attorney at GAINES GAULT HENDRIX, PC

3500 Blue Lake Drive, Suite 425

Birmingham, AL 35243

Michael Jason Marable

Attorney at GAINES GAULT & HENDRIX PC

361 Summit Boulevard

Birmingham, AL 35243

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Walmart Inc, Walmart Neighborhood Stores, Walmart Claims Services Inc from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Alabama, case number 01-cv-2021-903741, filed by Walmart Inc, Walmart Neighborhood Stores, Walmart Claims Services Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (MEB2) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

1 #1

Exhibit A

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF CONSENT to a magistrate judge in a civil action. (MEB2) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Jason Marable on behalf of Walmart Claims Services Inc, Walmart Inc, Walmart Neighborhood Stores (Marable, Michael) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

#4

(#4) **VACATE**ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-Accordingly, the plaintiff is ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE in writing, within fourteen (14) calendar days of the date of this order, why his claims against some or all of the defendants should not be dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure for his failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 02/11/2022. (AKD) Modified pursuant to Order (doc.6) on 2/16/2022 (AKD). (Entered: 02/11/2022)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by Walmart Claims Services Inc, Walmart Inc, Walmart Neighborhood Stores.(Pearce, Julie) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

#7

(#7) ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than April 1, 2022. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after April 1, 2022. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for March 7, 2022 at 11:00 a.m. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-336-1831 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 2778178. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 02/17/2022. (AKD) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

#8

(#8) ORDER regarding compliance with Rule 26; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/24/2022.Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 2/17/2022. (BST, ) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

#10

(#10) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Walmart Stores East LP, Walmart Inc, Walmart Claims Services Inc, Vincent Long. The telephone conference for 3/7/2022 is CANCELLED.(KEK) Modified on 3/16/2022 (AKD). (Entered: 03/04/2022)

#11

(#11) INITIAL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 3/7/2022. (BST, ) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

#12

(#12) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Pearce, Julie) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

#13

(#13) Joint MOTION to Dismiss and to Substitute Party Defendant by Walmart Claims Services Inc, Walmart Inc, Walmart Neighborhood Stores. (Pearce, Julie) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

#14

(#14) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Walmart Claims Services Inc, Walmart Inc, Walmart Neighborhood Stores. filed by Walmart Claims Services Inc, Walmart Inc, Walmart Neighborhood Stores (Pearce, Julie) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) TEXT ORDER:The parties have filed a joint motion seeking to substitute Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, for defendants Walmart Claims Services, Inc., Walmart, Inc., and Walmart Neighborhood Stores #13 . The motion is GRANTED. The Clerk is DIRECTED to TERM Walmart Claims Services, Inc., Walmart, Inc., and Walmart Neighborhood Stores as defendants and SUBSTITUTE Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, in their place. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 03/16/2022. (AKD) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Walmart Claims Services Inc, Walmart Inc, Walmart Neighborhood Stores. filed by Walmart Claims Services Inc, Walmart Inc, Walmart Neighborhood Stores (Pearce, Julie) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Joint MOTION to Dismiss and to Substitute Party Defendant by Walmart Claims Services Inc, Walmart Inc, Walmart Neighborhood Stores. (Pearce, Julie) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Pearce, Julie) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) INITIAL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 3/7/2022. (BST, ) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Walmart Stores East LP, Walmart Inc, Walmart Claims Services Inc, Vincent Long. The telephone conference for 3/7/2022 is CANCELLED.(KEK) Modified on 3/16/2022 (AKD). (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE to remind parties of consent telephone conference scheduled for 11:00 AM on Monday, 3/7/22; if all parties submit an executed consent form, either consenting or declining magistrate judge jurisdiction, the conference will be cancelled. (BST, ) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER regarding compliance with Rule 26; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/24/2022.Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 2/17/2022. (BST, ) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than April 1, 2022. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after April 1, 2022. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for March 7, 2022 at 11:00 a.m. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-336-1831 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 2778178. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 02/17/2022. (AKD) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) TEXT ORDER: After some or all of the defendants failed to respond to the complaint within the time prescribed, the court entered an order on February 11, 2022, directing the plaintiff to show cause why his claims against those defendants should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute #4 . The defendants filed an answer on February 15, 2022 #5 . On the basis of the defendants' answer, the undersigned VACATES the February 11, 2022 order to show cause, relieving the plaintiff of his obligation to respond to that order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 02/16/2022. (AKD) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by Walmart Claims Services Inc, Walmart Inc, Walmart Neighborhood Stores.(Pearce, Julie) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) **VACATE**ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-Accordingly, the plaintiff is ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE in writing, within fourteen (14) calendar days of the date of this order, why his claims against some or all of the defendants should not be dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure for his failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 02/11/2022. (AKD) Modified pursuant to Order (doc.6) on 2/16/2022 (AKD). (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Jason Marable on behalf of Walmart Claims Services Inc, Walmart Inc, Walmart Neighborhood Stores (Marable, Michael) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3999244 (ALND receipt# B4601118091). related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Walmart Inc, Walmart Neighborhood Stores, Walmart Claims Services Inc from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Alabama, case number 01-cv-2021-903741, filed by Walmart Inc, Walmart Neighborhood Stores, Walmart Claims Services Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (MEB2). (Graham, Amanda) Modified on 1/24/2022 (AKD). (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF CONSENT to a magistrate judge in a civil action. (MEB2) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Walmart Inc, Walmart Neighborhood Stores, Walmart Claims Services Inc from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Alabama, case number 01-cv-2021-903741, filed by Walmart Inc, Walmart Neighborhood Stores, Walmart Claims Services Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (MEB2) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Walmart Claims Services, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where WALMART is a litigant

Latest cases where Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Julie Davis Pearce