This case was last updated from PACER on 12/03/2019 at 08:14:31 (UTC).

Long v. Valentine

Case Summary

On 10/04/2019 Long filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Valentine. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Greg N. Stivers. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00141

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Greg N. Stivers

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Michael Wayne Long

Lagrange, KY 40032

Respondent

Anna Valentine

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) NOTICE received from USCA: Motion to File Second or Successive Habeas Petition Docketed in Case No. 19-6224, re #4 Order transferring #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (CDF) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 10/22/2019. The instant 2254 petition (DN #1 ) is TRANSFERRED to the Sixth Circuit Court of Appeals pursuant to 28 USC 1631.cc:Petitioner, pro se; Respondent; Attorney General; USCA, Clerk (JWM) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

#3

(#3) Letter from Michael Wayne Long enclosing filing fee. (JWM) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

#2

(#2) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (CDF) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

1 #4

cover letter & envelope

1 #3

miscellaneous enclosures

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Supplement

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Michael Wayne Long. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Exhibit, #3 miscellaneous enclosures, #4 cover letter & envelope) (CDF) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE received from USCA: Motion to File Second or Successive Habeas Petition Docketed in Case No. 19-6224, re #4 Order transferring #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (CDF) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 10/22/2019. The instant 2254 petition (DN #1 ) is TRANSFERRED to the Sixth Circuit Court of Appeals pursuant to 28 USC 1631.cc:Petitioner, pro se; Respondent; Attorney General; USCA, Clerk (JWM) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Letter from Michael Wayne Long enclosing filing fee. (JWM) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • Filing fee received: $5.00, receipt number 015167 by Michael Wayne Long. (CDF) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (CDF) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Michael Wayne Long. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Exhibit, #3 miscellaneous enclosures, #4 cover letter & envelope) (CDF) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less