This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/28/2020 at 08:27:13 (UTC).

LONG v. TOWLINE RIVER SERVICE, INC.

Case Summary

On 12/30/2019 LONG filed a Personal Injury - Marine lawsuit against TOWLINE RIVER SERVICE, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Cynthia Reed Eddy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01676

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Marine

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Cynthia Reed Eddy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RICHARD LONG

Defendant

TOWLINE RIVER SERVICE, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Dennis M. O'Bryan

Attorney at O'Bryan Baun Karamanian

401 South Woodward, Suite 463

Birmingham, MI 48009

Defendant Attorneys

Devon F. Ferris

Attorney at Dickie, McCamey & Chilcote P.C.

Two Ppg Place, Suite 400

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Dennis A Watson

Attorney at Dickie McCamey & Chilcote

2 Ppg Place, #400

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

 

Court Documents

#16

#15

#14

#17

#13

RESTRICTED

#12

#11

RESTRICTED

9 #1

Proposed Order

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

1 #2

Summons as to Townline River Service, Inc.

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #13 Stipulation. ERROR: Wrong event selected. CORRECTION: Re-docketed as Stipulation selecting ADR Process. This message is for informational purposes only. (ept) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER Implementing Federal Rule of Evidence 502(d) Pursuant to LCvR 16.1.D. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 2/26/2020. (nll) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: The parties shall file a Status Report by 5/15/2020; Amended Pleadings due by 5/31/2020; Fact Discovery due by 9/30/2020; ADR completed by 6/18/2020; Mid-Discovery Telephone Status Conference set for 6/18/2020 11:30 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy; Post-Discovery Status Conference set for 10/7/2020 at 09:30 AM in Suite 10160 before Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy as more fully set forth in the attached order. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 2/26/2020. (nll) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy: Initial Case Management Conference held on 2/26/2020. Parties shall file Status Report by 5/15/2020. (Court Reporter: None) (nll) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) STIPULATION selecting ADR process by TOWLINE RIVER SERVICE, INC.. (ept) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) STIPULATION Selecting ADR Process by TOWLINE RIVER SERVICE, INC.. (Ferris, Devon) Wrong event selected. Document removed from public view and redocketed at #17 . Modified text on 2/27/2020. (ept) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Ferris, Devon) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by TOWLINE RIVER SERVICE, INC.. (Ferris, Devon) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #9 Motion to appear telephonically for Initial Case Management Conference. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 2/18/20. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (Eddy, J.) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to appear telephonically for Initial Case Management Conf. by RICHARD LONG. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (O'Bryan, Dennis) (Entered: 02/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by TOWLINE RIVER SERVICE, INC.. (Ferris, Devon) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #6 Answer to Complaint. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 2/3/2020. (cjo) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) INITIAL LOCAL RULE 16.1 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/26/2020 01:30 PM in Suite 10160 before Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy; Rule 26 Meeting to be conducted on or before 2/5/2020; Rule 26 Meeting Report, Proposed Case Management Order, ADR Stipulation, Confidential Position Letters and Willingness to proceed before Magistrate Judge due by 2/21/2020 as more fully set forth in the attached order. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 1/24/2020. (nll) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by TOWLINE RIVER SERVICE, INC.. (Watson, Dennis) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis A Watson on behalf of TOWLINE RIVER SERVICE, INC.. (Watson, Dennis) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Devon F. Ferris on behalf of TOWLINE RIVER SERVICE, INC.. (Ferris, Devon) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STANDING ORDER ON RULE 12(b) MOTIONS. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 12/31/2019. (sms) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to TOWLINE RIVER SERVICE, INC. (jv) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against TOWLINE RIVER SERVICE, INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5407481), filed by RICHARD LONG. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons as to Townline River Service, Inc.) (jv) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TOWLINE RIVER SERVICE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Devon F. Ferris