This case was last updated from PACER on 03/25/2020 at 07:13:35 (UTC).

LONG v. SAUL

Case Summary

On 01/25/2020 LONG filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against SAUL. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are James Patrick Hanlon and Mark J. Dinsmore. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00289

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James Patrick Hanlon

Referral Judge

Mark J. Dinsmore

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PAULINA LONG

Defendant

ANDREW M. SAUL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jonelle L. Redelman

Attorney at REDELMAN LAW LLC

101 W Ohio St, Ste 2000

Indianapolis, IN 46204

 

Court Documents

#4

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) ENTRY - Plaintiffs Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, [Dkt. #3 ], is GRANTED. 28 U.S.C. 1915(a). Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 1/27/2020. (DWH) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Julian Clifford Wierenga on behalf of Defendant ANDREW M. SAUL. (Wierenga, Julian) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ENTRY - Plaintiffs Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, [Dkt. #3 ], is GRANTED. 28 U.S.C. 1915(a). Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 1/27/2020. (DWH) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , filed by Plaintiff PAULINA LONG. (Redelman, Jonelle) (Entered: 01/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Jonelle L. Redelman on behalf of Plaintiff PAULINA LONG. (Redelman, Jonelle) (Entered: 01/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against ANDREW M. SAUL, filed by PAULINA LONG. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Redelman, Jonelle) (Entered: 01/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less