This case was last updated from PACER on 07/18/2021 at 09:58:30 (UTC).

Long v. Long et al

Case Summary

On 05/19/2021 Long filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Long. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard B. Farrer and Fred Biery. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-00479

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Richard B. Farrer

Presiding Judge

Fred Biery

 

Party Details

Defendants

Corporal James Plummer

Rita Kruger

Jacob Wayne Bellington

Lacy Lakeview Police Department

City of Frisco

Charity Borserine

Sgt. Kyle Pemberton

Texas Department of Family & Protective Services

Amber Shemesh

Taylor Mohr

Ernest Flores

Kim Mitton

Ray Wheless

Rachel Li

Dan Wayne Apperson

Dr. Whitney Morgan

Chelsea Deel

Child Advocacy Center of Collin County

Sgt. Stephen Byrom

Guadalupe Regional Medical Center

21 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) Pro Se MOTION for Permission to file Electronically by Michael Jon Long. Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (bc) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

3 #1

*Restricted*

#3

(#3) PRO SE MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael Jon Long. (Attachments: #1 Sealed Document Proposed Amended Complaint). Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (bc) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

#2

(#2) Case Opening Letter to Michael Jon Long. (dtg) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Proposed Complaint and Request for Injunction

#1

(#1) MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael Jon Long. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint and Request for Injunction, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (dtg) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Pro Se MOTION for Permission to file Electronically by Michael Jon Long. Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (bc) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PRO SE MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael Jon Long. (Attachments: #1 Sealed Document Proposed Amended Complaint). Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (bc) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Case Opening Letter to Michael Jon Long. (dtg) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael Jon Long. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint and Request for Injunction, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (dtg) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Richard B. Farrer. (dtg) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketTHIS CASE HAS BEEN RANDOMLY ASSIGNED TO JUDGE FRED BIERY. (dtg) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less