This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/31/2020 at 09:32:08 (UTC).

Long v. Butler et al (INMATE 2)

Case Summary

On 09/01/2020 Long filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Butler INMATE 2. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Emily C. Marks and Jerusha T. Adams. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00649

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Emily C. Marks

Referral Judge

Jerusha T. Adams

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joseph Brent Long

Clayton, AL 36016

Defendants

Jefferson S. Dunn

Kay Ivey

Reosha Butler

Wexford Health Sources, Inc.

Celeste Hunter

Walter Myers

Sherry Price

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Bart Gregory Harmon

Attorney at Alabama Department of Corrections

301 South Ripley Street

Montgomery, AL 36104

Carrie Ellis McCollum

Attorney at Alabama Department of Corrections

301 South Ripley Street

Montgomery, AL 36104

 

Court Documents

#17

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

6 #1

Exhibit A

#6

#5

#4

#3

2 #2

Appendix F

2 #1

Appendix E

#2

#1

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Return Receipt Card showing service of #10 Order to Show Cause signed by name illegible for Wexford Health Sources, Inc. served 10/21/2020. (dmn, ) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Return Receipt Card showing service of #6 Amended Inmate 1983 Complaint, and #9 Order of Procedure signed by name illegible for Wexford Health Sources, Inc. served on 10/21/2020, answer due 11/30/2020. (dmn, ) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Return Receipt Card showing service of #10 Order to Show Cause, signed by Kristi Simpson for ALDOC General Counsel, served on 10/22/2020.(amf, ) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Return Receipt Card showing service of #6 Amended Inmate 1983 Complaint & #9 Order, signed by Barbara Baldwin for Jefferson S. Dunn, served on 10/20/2020, answer due 11/30/2020. (amf, ) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketAO FORM 85 mailed to counsel for Defendants Reosha Butler, Jefferson S. Dunn, Walter Myers, & Sherry Price. (No PDF attached to this entry) (amf, ) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***PURSUANT TO THE #11 NOTICE - Attorney Carrie Ellis McCollum for Defendants Reosha Butler, Jefferson S. Dunn, Walter Myers, & Sherry Price added. (No PDF attached to this entry) (amf, ) Modified on 10/23/2020 to also reflect Defendant Butler (amf, ). (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Reosha Butler, Jefferson S. Dunn, Walter Myers, Sherry Price. (Harmon, Bart) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Bart Gregory Harmon on behalf of Reosha Butler, Jefferson S. Dunn, Walter Myers, Sherry Price (Harmon, Bart) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Return Receipt Card showing service of #6 Amended Inmate 1983 Complaint & #9 Order, signed by D McCray for Celeste Hunter, served on 10/20/2020, answer due 11/30/2020. (amf, ) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER: In the amended complaint, Plaintiff requests issuance of a preliminary injunction. Doc. #6 at 5. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that on or before 11/6/2020, Defendants shall file a response to the motion for preliminary injunction in which they SHOW CAUSE why this motion should not be granted. The Clerk is DIRECTED to provide a copy of this order and the request for preliminary injunctive relief (Doc. #6 ) and any attachments to this pleading via certified mail to General Counsel for the ADOC and General Counsel for Wexford Health Sources, Inc. The court is aware that counsel has not yet entered an appearance on behalf of the named Defendants, and infers no waiver of service on any Defendant simply because counsel is ordered to respond as set forth herein. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 10/16/2020. Copy mailed CMRRR with Doc. #6 to General Counsel for ADOC and General Counsel for Wexford Health Sources, Inc. as directed. (dmn, ) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Joseph Brent Long. (dmn, ) (no pdf, see Doc. #6 for pdf) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Extension by Joseph Brent Long. (amf, ) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AMENDED Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Reosha Butler, Jefferson S. Dunn, Celeste Hunter, Walter Myers, Sherry Price, Wexford Health Sources, Inc., filed by Joseph Brent Long. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(amf, ) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER: Upon review the court finds the complaint (Doc. #2 ) contains deficiencies. It is ORDERED that on or before 9/23/2020 Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint as further set out in the order. To aid Plaintiff in filing a response to this order, the Clerk is DIRECTED to provide him with a copy of the form used by prisoners to file 1983 complaints, and Plaintiff shall use this form in filing his amended complaint. The court will consider only those claims set forth and defendants named in the amended complaint. The amended complaint shall therefore supersede the original complaint. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 9/9/2020. Copy with 1983 complaint for mailed to Plaintiff as directed. (dmn, ) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER ON MOTION directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at Ventress CF. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 9/9/2020. (dmn, ) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Joseph Brent Long. (amf, ) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Joseph Brent Long. (No PDF attached to this entry - See doc #2 for PDF) (amf, ) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by Joseph Brent Long. (No PDF attached to this entry - See doc #2 for PDF) (amf, ) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Reosha Butler, Jefferson S. Dunn, Kay Ivey, filed by Joseph Brent Long. (Attachments: #1 Appendix E, #2 Appendix F)(amf, ) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ORDER (entered in 2:20-cv-00625-RAH): it is ORDERED that this case proceed with Girlis Hugh Serratt as the sole plaintiff; DIRECTING the Clerk to: 1) Open a separate civil action for each of the other inmates who signed the complaint; 2) Strike the in forma pauperis applications filed by all inmates other than inmate Girlis Hugh Serratt from the file in this case; 3) Place a copy of the complaint and the particular in forma pauperis application filed by the inmate whose name in which the new case is opened in the newly opened case; 4) Assign each newly opened case to a District Judge and Magistrate Judge in the normal docketing process. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 9/1/2020. (amf, ) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wexford Health Soures Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bart Gregory Harmon

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Carrie Ellis McCollum