This case was last updated from PACER on 08/10/2019 at 07:55:07 (UTC).

Long v. Boucher et al

Case Summary

On 06/11/2019 Long filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Boucher. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District. The Judges overseeing this case are Paul M. Warner, Dustin B. Pead and Howard C. Nielson, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00056

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Utah District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Dustin B. Pead

Presiding Judges

Paul M. Warner

Howard C. Nielson, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Scott C. Long

Defendants

North Salt Lake City

Elizabeth Boucher

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher Peter Sorensen

Attorney at SYKES MCALLISTER LAW OFFICES

311 S State St Ste 240

Salt Lake City, UT 84111-2320

Robert B. Sykes

Attorney at SYKES MCALLISTER LAW OFFICES

311 S State St Ste 240

Salt Lake City, UT 84111-2320

Defendant Attorneys

Heather S. White

Attorney at SNOW CHRISTENSEN & MARTINEAU

10 Exchange Place 11Th Fl, Po Box 45000

Salt Lake City, UT 84145-5000

Danica N. Cepernich

Attorney at SNOW CHRISTENSEN & MARTINEAU

10 Exchange Place 11Th Fl, Po Box 45000

Salt Lake City, UT 84145-5000

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #13 MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 9/4/2019 Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 8/7/2019. (jwt) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

16 #1

Text of Proposed Order to Extend Time to Respond to MTD

#16

(#16) Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Scott C. Long. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order to Extend Time to Respond to MTD) Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(Sykes, Robert) Modified on 8/7/2019 - correcting motion event(jwt). (Entered: 08/07/2019)

#13

(#13) MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendants Elizabeth Boucher, North Salt Lake City. (White, Heather) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

#14

(#14) Stipulated MOTION to Delay Scheduling and Discovery Pending Decision on Dispostive Motion filed by Defendants Elizabeth Boucher, North Salt Lake City. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(White, Heather) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

#15

(#15) ORDER granting #14 Motion to Delay Scheduling and Discovery Pending Decision on Dispositive Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 7/11/2019. (las) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

14 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Danica N. Cepernich on behalf of Elizabeth Boucher, North Salt Lake City (Cepernich, Danica) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendants Elizabeth Boucher, North Salt Lake City, Plaintiff Scott C. Long. Form due by 7/5/2019. (las) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendants Elizabeth Boucher, North Salt Lake City, Plaintiff Scott C. Long. (las) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Heather S. White on behalf of Elizabeth Boucher, North Salt Lake City (White, Heather) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

#4

(#4) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #2 Complaint, Acknowledgment filed by Elizabeth Boucher, North Salt Lake City. All Defendants. (White, Heather) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT & Jury Demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3298639) filed by Scott C. Long. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner (Sykes, Robert) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

2 #5

Exhibit 5

2 #6

Exhibit 6

2 #8

Exhibit 8

2 #7

Exhibit 7

2 #9

Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #13 MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 9/4/2019 Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 8/7/2019. (jwt) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Scott C. Long. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order to Extend Time to Respond to MTD) Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(Sykes, Robert) Modified on 8/7/2019 - correcting motion event(jwt). (Entered: 08/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER granting #14 Motion to Delay Scheduling and Discovery Pending Decision on Dispositive Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 7/11/2019. (las) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Stipulated MOTION to Delay Scheduling and Discovery Pending Decision on Dispostive Motion filed by Defendants Elizabeth Boucher, North Salt Lake City. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(White, Heather) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendants Elizabeth Boucher, North Salt Lake City. (White, Heather) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • (#12) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr on 7/8/2019. (las) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Danica N. Cepernich on behalf of Elizabeth Boucher, North Salt Lake City (Cepernich, Danica) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • (#10) All Consent/Reassignment Forms have now been received. After review of all forms, Case Reassigned to District Judge per request of one or more party(s). Case randomly assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner no longer assigned to the case. (las) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • (#9) RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendants Elizabeth Boucher, North Salt Lake City. (las) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • (#8) RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Scott C. Long. (las) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendants Elizabeth Boucher, North Salt Lake City, Plaintiff Scott C. Long. Form due by 7/5/2019. (las) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendants Elizabeth Boucher, North Salt Lake City, Plaintiff Scott C. Long. (las) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Heather S. White on behalf of Elizabeth Boucher, North Salt Lake City (White, Heather) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #2 Complaint, Acknowledgment filed by Elizabeth Boucher, North Salt Lake City. All Defendants. (White, Heather) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 6/12/2019. (jds) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT & Jury Demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3298639) filed by Scott C. Long. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner (Sykes, Robert) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner. Plaintiff Scott C. Long is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.