This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/05/2021 at 07:11:05 (UTC).

LONG, JR. v. INDIANA HARBOR INSURANCE CO.

Case Summary

On 02/04/2021 LONG, JR filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against INDIANA HARBOR INSURANCE CO. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00521

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAWRENCE LONG, JR.

Defendant

INDIANA HARBOR INSURANCE CO.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BRAD S. TABAKIN

Attorney at TABAKINWOLFE, LLP

1000 Germantown Pike, B-3

Plymouth Meeting, PA 19462

RICHARD A. WOLFE

Attorney at TabakinWolfe, LLP

1000 Germantown Pike, B-3

Plymouth, PA 19462

Defendant Attorney

DAVID G. VOLK

Attorney at CIPRIANI & WERNER PC

450 Sentry Pkwy Suite 200

Blue Bell, PA 19422

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ORDER THAT A PRETRIAL CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 4/13/2021 AT 9:00 AM BEFORE HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 3/16/21. 3/16/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID G. VOLK on behalf of INDIANA HARBOR INSURANCE CO. with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(VOLK, DAVID) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

3 #2

Exhibit Ex. B

3 #1

Exhibit Ex. A

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by LAWRENCE LONG, JR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A, #2 Exhibit Ex. B)(TABAKIN, BRAD) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

#2

(#2) ORDER THAT UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNED TO THE CASE IS HONORABLE LYNNE A. SITARSKI. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 2/16/21. 2/16/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, ) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

1 #4

Exhibit Ex. A

1 #3

Designation Form Designation Form

1 #2

Case Management Track Form Case Management Track Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Coversheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against INDIANA HARBOR INSURANCE CO. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-14893289.), filed by LAWRENCE LONG, JR.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Coversheet, #2 Case Management Track Form Case Management Track Form, #3 Designation Form Designation Form, #4 Exhibit Ex. A)(TABAKIN, BRAD) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER THAT A PRETRIAL CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 4/13/2021 AT 9:00 AM BEFORE HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 3/16/21. 3/16/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID G. VOLK on behalf of INDIANA HARBOR INSURANCE CO. with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(VOLK, DAVID) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by LAWRENCE LONG, JR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A, #2 Exhibit Ex. B)(TABAKIN, BRAD) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER THAT UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNED TO THE CASE IS HONORABLE LYNNE A. SITARSKI. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 2/16/21. 2/16/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, ) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued as to INDIANA HARBOR INSURANCE CO.. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 2/5/21 (bw, ) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by LAWRENCE LONG, JR.. (md, ) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against INDIANA HARBOR INSURANCE CO. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-14893289.), filed by LAWRENCE LONG, JR.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Coversheet, #2 Case Management Track Form Case Management Track Form, #3 Designation Form Designation Form, #4 Exhibit Ex. A)(TABAKIN, BRAD) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INDIAN HARBOR INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVID G. VOLK