This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/31/2022 at 07:24:31 (UTC).

LONG et al v. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT

Case Summary

On 09/01/2022 LONG filed a Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act lawsuit against IMMIGRATION CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Amit P. Mehta. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-02655

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Amit P. Mehta

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SUSAN B. LONG

TRAC Reports, Inc.

DAVID BURNHAM

Defendant

IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Scott Lawrence Nelson

Attorney at PUBLIC CITIZEN LITIGATION GROUP

1600 20Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20009-1001

Michael T. Kirkpatrick

Attorney at PUBLIC CITIZEN LITIGATION GROUP

1600 20Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20009

Defendant Attorney

Derek S. Hammond

Attorney at DOJ-USAO

601 D Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20530

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by DAVID BURNHAM, SUSAN B. LONG, TRAC Reports, Inc.. Case related to Case No. 14-cv-0109. (Nelson, Scott) (Entered: 09/01/2022)

#3

(#3) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests of TRAC Reports, Inc. by DAVID BURNHAM, SUSAN B. LONG, TRAC Reports, Inc. (Nelson, Scott) (Entered: 09/01/2022)

4 #4

Main Document

4 #1

Notice and Consent

#5

(#5) REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE to (1) U.S.A.O. and (2) U.S.A.G. re #1 Complaint, filed by SUSAN B. LONG, TRAC REPORTS, INC., DAVID BURNHAM. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by DAVID BURNHAM, SUSAN B. LONG, TRAC REPORTS, INC..(Nelson, Scott) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael T. Kirkpatrick on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Kirkpatrick, Michael) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (zed) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Derek S. Hammond on behalf of All Defendants (Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to Complaint by IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT.(Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

#10

(#10) ORDER. Both a Complaint and an Answer are now before the court in this FOIA case. It is hereby ordered that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before October 25, 2022. The Joint Status Report should address, among other things, (1) the status of Plaintiffs' FOIA request; (2) the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiffs' FOIA request; (3) the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiffs; (4) whether a motion for a stay is likely under Open America v. Watergate Special Prosecution Force, 547 F.2d 605 (D.C. Cir. 1976); and (5) whether the parties anticipate summary judgment briefing and, if so, a proposed briefing schedule. Please see Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/12/2022. (lcapm3) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

#11

(#11) Joint STATUS REPORT by DAVID BURNHAM, SUSAN B. LONG, TRAC REPORTS, INC.. (Nelson, Scott) (Entered: 10/25/2022)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by November 22, 2022, which updates the court on the processing and production of responsive information. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/26/2022. (lcapm3) (Entered: 10/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Joint STATUS REPORT by DAVID BURNHAM, SUSAN B. LONG, TRAC REPORTS, INC.. (Nelson, Scott) (Entered: 10/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER. Both a Complaint and an Answer are now before the court in this FOIA case. It is hereby ordered that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before October 25, 2022. The Joint Status Report should address, among other things, (1) the status of Plaintiffs' FOIA request; (2) the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiffs' FOIA request; (3) the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiffs; (4) whether a motion for a stay is likely under Open America v. Watergate Special Prosecution Force, 547 F.2d 605 (D.C. Cir. 1976); and (5) whether the parties anticipate summary judgment briefing and, if so, a proposed briefing schedule. Please see Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/12/2022. (lcapm3) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to Complaint by IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT.(Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Derek S. Hammond on behalf of All Defendants (Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (zed) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael T. Kirkpatrick on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Kirkpatrick, Michael) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE to (1) U.S.A.O. and (2) U.S.A.G. re #1 Complaint, filed by SUSAN B. LONG, TRAC REPORTS, INC., DAVID BURNHAM. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by DAVID BURNHAM, SUSAN B. LONG, TRAC REPORTS, INC..(Nelson, Scott) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Complaint; emailed to snelson@citizen.org, cc'd 1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Missing summonses-government. When naming a government agent or agency as a defendant, you must supply a summons for each defendant & two additional summonses for the U.S. Attorney & U.S. Attorney General. Please submit using the event Request for Summons to Issue. (Wilkens, Nicole) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(znmw) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (znmw) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests of TRAC Reports, Inc. by DAVID BURNHAM, SUSAN B. LONG, TRAC Reports, Inc. (Nelson, Scott) (Entered: 09/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by DAVID BURNHAM, SUSAN B. LONG, TRAC Reports, Inc.. Case related to Case No. 14-cv-0109. (Nelson, Scott) (Entered: 09/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9486581) filed by SUSAN B. LONG, TRAC REPORTS, INC., DAVID BURNHAM (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Nelson, Scott) Modified parties on 9/6/2022 (znmw). (Entered: 09/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Immigration and Customs Enforcement is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Derek Hammond