This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 08:23:02 (UTC).

Long #162838 v. Ryan et al

Case Summary

On 08/23/2019 a Prisoner - Prison Condition case was filed by Long 162838 against Ryan in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Arizona District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-05024

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arizona District

Judge Details

Deborah M Fine (PS)

 

Party Details

Defendants

Unknown Espinoza

Unknown Vega

Teri Sheard

Russ Bruner

Unknown Wacasey

Charles L Ryan

Unknown Coleman

Unknown Quintero

Unknown Murry

Unknown Party

 

Court Documents

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

(#2) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Larry Bernard Long. (2 pages) (MSA) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (MSA) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF PARTY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Larry Bernard Long: #162838, ASPC-Buckley Unit, PO Box 3400, Buckeye, AZ 85326. (MSA) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

#1

(#1) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed by Larry Bernard Long. (11 pages)(MSA) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE: This case is subject to electronic filing. See document for complete details. (MSA) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF PARTY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Larry Bernard Long: #162838, ASPC-Buckley Unit, PO Box 3400, Buckeye, AZ 85326. (MSA) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (MSA) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE: This case is subject to electronic filing. See document for complete details. (MSA) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Larry Bernard Long. (1 page) (MSA) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Larry Bernard Long. (2 pages) (MSA) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed by Larry Bernard Long. (11 pages)(MSA) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.