This case was last updated from PACER on 10/17/2021 at 12:07:22 (UTC).

Lone Star Targeted Advertising, LLC v. Viant Technology LLC

Case Summary

On 08/18/2021 Lone Star Targeted Advertising, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Viant Technology LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Maryellen Noreika. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01187

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Maryellen Noreika

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lone Star Targeted Advertising, LLC

Defendant

Viant Technology LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stamatios Stamoulis

Attorney at Stamoulis & Weinblatt LLC

800 N. West Street, Third Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Viant Technology LLC on 8/19/2021. (smg) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent First State Targeted Advertising, LLC for Lone Star Targeted Advertising, LLC filed by Lone Star Targeted Advertising, LLC. (smg) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) U.S. 6,301,619 B1. (smg) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (smg) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for PATENT INFRINGEMENT - filed with Jury Demand against Viant Technology LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3681573.) - filed by Lone Star Targeted Advertising, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(smg) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Vizant Technologies, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Lone Star Targeted Advertising LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stamatios Stamoulis