This case was last updated from PACER on 09/25/2020 at 09:48:42 (UTC).

Lone Star Targeted Advertising, LLC v. Steel House, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/27/2020 Lone Star Targeted Advertising, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Steel House, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Maryellen Noreika. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01001

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Maryellen Noreika

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lone Star Targeted Advertising, LLC

Defendant

Steel House, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stamatios Stamoulis

Attorney at Stamoulis & Weinblatt LLC

800 N. West Street, Third Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) Second STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant to respond to the Complaint to October 18, 2020 - filed by Lone Star Targeted Advertising, LLC. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#7

(#7) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant to respond to the Complaint to September 18, 2020 - filed by Lone Star Targeted Advertising, LLC. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lone Star Targeted Advertising, LLC. Steel House, Inc. served on 7/29/2020, answer due 8/19/2020. (Weinblatt, Richard) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

#5

(#5) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (myr) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

#4

(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent First State Targeted Advertising, LLC for Lone Star Targeted Advertising, LLC filed by Lone Star Targeted Advertising, LLC. (myr) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

#3

(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) U.S. 6,301,619 B1. (myr) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Steel House, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-3089017.) - filed by Lone Star Targeted Advertising, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED re #8 Second STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant to respond to the Complaint to October 18, 2020 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Steel House, Inc. answer due 10/18/2020). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 9/21/2020. (dlw) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Second STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant to respond to the Complaint to October 18, 2020 - filed by Lone Star Targeted Advertising, LLC. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED re #7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant to respond to the Complaint to September 18, 2020 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Steel House, Inc. answer due 9/18/2020). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 8/19/2020. (dlw) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant to respond to the Complaint to September 18, 2020 - filed by Lone Star Targeted Advertising, LLC. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lone Star Targeted Advertising, LLC. Steel House, Inc. served on 7/29/2020, answer due 8/19/2020. (Weinblatt, Richard) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (myr) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent First State Targeted Advertising, LLC for Lone Star Targeted Advertising, LLC filed by Lone Star Targeted Advertising, LLC. (myr) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) U.S. 6,301,619 B1. (myr) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Steel House, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-3089017.) - filed by Lone Star Targeted Advertising, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less