This case was last updated from PACER on 03/09/2020 at 07:33:21 (UTC).

LOMBREGLIA et al v. SUNBEAM PRODUCTS, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 01/09/2020 LOMBREGLIA filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against SUNBEAM PRODUCTS, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Douglas E. Arpert and Freda L. Wolfson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00332

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Douglas E. Arpert

Presiding Judge

Freda L. Wolfson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PAMELA LOMBREGLIA

VINCENT LOMBREGLIA

Defendants

SUNBEAM PRODUCTS, INC.

JOHN DOES

ABC CORPORATION

WALGREEN CO.

JANE ROES

JOHN DOES 1-25

JANE DOES 1-25

WALGREEN'S CO.

ABC CORPORATION 1-25

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL A. GALPERN

Attorney at JAVERBAUM WURGAFT HICKS KAHN WIKSTROM &SININS

1000 Haddonfield-Berlin Road, Suite 203

Voorhees, NJ 08043

Defendant Attorney

DAVID S. OSTERMAN

Attorney at GOLDBERG SEGALLA

301 Carnegie Center Drive, Suite 200

Princeton, NJ 08540

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 7/13/2020 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Telephone Status Conference set for 5/18/2020 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. The parties initial written discovery requests must be served by March 20, 2020. Any motion to amend the pleadings or to join new parties, whether by amended or third party complaint, must be filed by June 30, 2020. Fact discover is to be completed by 11/30/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 02/26/2020. (jdb) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by SUNBEAM PRODUCTS, INC., WALGREEN'S CO..(OSTERMAN, DAVID) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#4

(#4) Order Initial Conference set for 2/25/2020 at 10:30 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 6W before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 1/13/2020. (ce3) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by WALGREEN CO. identifying Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (OSTERMAN, DAVID) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by SUNBEAM PRODUCTS, INC. identifying Newell Brands Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (OSTERMAN, DAVID) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

1 #2

Certificate of Service

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WALGREEN CO., SUNBEAM PRODUCTS, INC. from Suprioer Court of NJ/Monmouth, case number MON-L-3991-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10237585), filed by WALGREEN CO., SUNBEAM PRODUCTS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate of Service)(OSTERMAN, DAVID) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 7/13/2020 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Telephone Status Conference set for 5/18/2020 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. The parties initial written discovery requests must be served by March 20, 2020. Any motion to amend the pleadings or to join new parties, whether by amended or third party complaint, must be filed by June 30, 2020. Fact discover is to be completed by 11/30/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 02/26/2020. (jdb) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketText Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 2/25/2020. (ce3) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by SUNBEAM PRODUCTS, INC., WALGREEN'S CO..(OSTERMAN, DAVID) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order Initial Conference set for 2/25/2020 at 10:30 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 6W before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 1/13/2020. (ce3) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketChief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (abr) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by WALGREEN CO. identifying Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (OSTERMAN, DAVID) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by SUNBEAM PRODUCTS, INC. identifying Newell Brands Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (OSTERMAN, DAVID) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WALGREEN CO., SUNBEAM PRODUCTS, INC. from Suprioer Court of NJ/Monmouth, case number MON-L-3991-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10237585), filed by WALGREEN CO., SUNBEAM PRODUCTS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate of Service)(OSTERMAN, DAVID) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sunbeam Products, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Walgreen Co. is a litigant

Latest cases where ABC CORPORATIONS 1-100 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Scott Osterman