This case was last updated from PACER on 04/11/2021 at 09:51:13 (UTC).

Lollar v. General Packaging, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 02/10/2021 Lollar filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against General Packaging, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Roy Percy, Sharion Aycock and Glen H. Davidson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00020

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Roy Percy

Presiding Judges

Sharion Aycock

Glen H. Davidson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Blakely Lollar

Defendants

D.E. Sourcing, LLC

General Packaging, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Richard Shane McLaughlin

Attorney at MCLAUGHLIN LAW FIRM

P.O. Box 200

Tupelo, MS 38802

Defendant Attorneys

James Gregory Brown

Attorney at JAMES GREGORY BROWN, ATTORNEY AT LAW

Post Office Box 508

Pontotoc, MS 38863-0508

James Leon Holt, Jr.

Attorney at JACKSON, SHIELDS, YEISER, HOLT, OWEN & BRYANT

262 German Oak Drive

Memphis, TN 38018

George B. Ready

Attorney at GEORGE B. READY, ATTORNEY

P.O. Box 127

Hernando, MS 38632

Stephen L. Shields

Attorney at Jackson Shields Yeiser & Holt

262 German Oak Drive

Memphis, TN 38018

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney James L. Holt, Jr.; granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Stephen L. Shields. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 3/29/2021. (yf)

14 #1

Exhibit Shields TN Certificate

#14

(#14) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Stephen L. Shields,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number AMSNDC-1925923) by General Packaging, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Shields TN Certificate) (Ready, George)

13 #2

Exhibit Holt CA Certificate

13 #1

Exhibit Holt TN Certificate

#13

(#13) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney James L. Holt, Jr.,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number AMSNDC-1925908) by General Packaging, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Holt TN Certificate, #2 Exhibit Holt CA Certificate) (Ready, George)

#12

(#12) ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 3/23/2021. (yf)

#11

(#11) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by D.E. Sourcing, LLC. (Brown, James)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Gregory Brown on behalf of D.E. Sourcing, LLC (Brown, James)

#9

(#9) INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 5/6/2021 11:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 3/23/2021. (rtc)

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. General Packaging, Inc. answer due 4/15/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 3/23/2021. (yf)

#7

(#7) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by General Packaging, Inc.. (Ready, George)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by George B. Ready on behalf of General Packaging, Inc. (Ready, George)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard Shane McLaughlin on behalf of Blakely Lollar D.E. Sourcing, LLC served on 3/2/2021. (McLaughlin, Richard)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B - EEOC Notice of Right to Sue

1 #1

Errata A - Charge of Discrimination

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMSNDC-1907043, filed by Blakely Lollar. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Charge of Discrimination, #2 Exhibit B - EEOC Notice of Right to Sue, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla) Modified on 2/11/2021 (tab).

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney James L. Holt, Jr.; granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Stephen L. Shields. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 3/29/2021. (yf)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Stephen L. Shields,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number AMSNDC-1925923) by General Packaging, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Shields TN Certificate) (Ready, George)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney James L. Holt, Jr.,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number AMSNDC-1925908) by General Packaging, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Holt TN Certificate, #2 Exhibit Holt CA Certificate) (Ready, George)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: D.E. Sourcing, LLC answer due 4/15/2021. (yf)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 3/23/2021. (yf)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by D.E. Sourcing, LLC. (Brown, James)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Gregory Brown on behalf of D.E. Sourcing, LLC (Brown, James)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 5/6/2021 11:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 3/23/2021. (rtc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. General Packaging, Inc. answer due 4/15/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 3/23/2021. (yf)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by General Packaging, Inc.. (Ready, George)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by George B. Ready on behalf of General Packaging, Inc. (Ready, George)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard Shane McLaughlin on behalf of Blakely Lollar D.E. Sourcing, LLC served on 3/2/2021. (McLaughlin, Richard)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard Shane McLaughlin on behalf of Blakely Lollar General Packaging, Inc. served on 3/3/2021. (McLaughlin, Richard)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Sharion Aycock recused. Case reassigned to Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 2/11/21. (jla)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jla)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to D.E. Sourcing, LLC, General Packaging, Inc.; emailed to Attorney for service. (jla)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMSNDC-1907043, filed by Blakely Lollar. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Charge of Discrimination, #2 Exhibit B - EEOC Notice of Right to Sue, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla) Modified on 2/11/2021 (tab).

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard Shane McLaughlin