This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/31/2021 at 08:06:38 (UTC).

LOKIETZ v. JOHNSON & JOHNSON et al

Case Summary

On 11/01/2021 LOKIETZ filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against JOHNSON JOHNSON. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Raag Singhal. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:21-CV-62261

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Raag Singhal

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARCY LOKIETZ

Defendants

JOHNSON & JOHNSON

NEUTROGENA CORPORATION

JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gary S. Graifman

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Summons

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., NEUTROGENA CORPORATION. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mg, ) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

#3

(#3) Order of MDL Panel (CTO-1) transferring case to the USDC for the FLSD. (dm ) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

4 #4

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

4 #1

*Restricted*

#12

(#8) ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSURE. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 11/2/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSURE. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 11/2/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICEUnless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion, legal memorandum, brief, and otherwise shall: be double-spaced, in justified alignment, in 12-point font, using either Times New Roman or Arial typeface. This Notice does not supplant the requirements and provisions of Local Rule 7.1(c). The Court cautions parties against excessive use of footnotes.Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions.Parties are encouraged to seek extensions of time in a timely fashion. "A motion for extension of time is not self-executing; no motion is, unless expressly provided for by the applicable rule. Yet, by filing these motions on or near the last day, and then sitting idle pending the Court's disposition of the motion, parties essentially grant their own motion. The Court will not condone this." Compere v. Nusret Miami, LLC, 2020 WL 2844888, at *2 (S.D. Fla. May 7, 2020) (internal citations omitted).Local Rule 16.4, Local Rules for the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida, requires that a Notice of Settlement "shall be filed and served jointly by counsel for all parties to the settlement." A unilateral notice of settlement will not stay pre-trial deadlines or hearings.Failure to comply with any of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 11/1/2021. (eca) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • Docket(#6) MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from District of New Jersey. Case Number 3:21-cv-17290 with documents 1-3. Assigned FLSD Case Number 0:21-cv-62261-AHS Lokietz v. Johnson & Johnson et al on 11/1/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 0:21-md-03015-AHS pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 1. Clerks Note: JPML notified (mc) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • Docket(#5) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Raag Singhal. (mc) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Case transferred in from New Jersey; Case Number 3:21-cv-17290. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(mc). (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order of MDL Panel (CTO-1) transferring case to the USDC for the FLSD. (dm ) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., NEUTROGENA CORPORATION. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mg, ) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketChief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (mg, ) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: In the future when choosing parties please choose each party individually. Do NOT select the ALL PLAINTIFFS or ALL DEFENDANTS button . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, ) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., NEUTROGENA CORPORATION. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12821046) with JURY DEMAND, filed by MARCY LOKIETZ. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(GRAIFMAN, GARY) Modified on 9/22/2021 (mg). Modified on 10/1/2021 (dm). (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less