This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/20/2021 at 08:40:58 (UTC).

LOKIETZ v. JOHNSON & JOHNSON et al

Case Summary

On September 21, 2021, Marcy Lokietz (“Plaintiff”), on behalf of herself and others similarly situated, represented by Gary S. Graifman of Kantrowitz of Goldhamer & Graifman, PC, filed a personal property fraud lawsuit against Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, and Neutrogena Corporation (collectively, “J&J” or “Defendants”), seeking injunctive reliefs and damages along with prejudgement interest, as well as other reliefs, for the alleged fraudulent concealment of the amount of Benzene in the product manufactured and sold by the Defendants. This case was filed in U.S. District Court in the District of New Jersey with Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni presiding.

In the complaint, the Plaintiff alleged that, “Defendants manufacture, sell, market, and distribute several over-the-counter Sunscreen Products under the brand name "Neutrogena." Several of Defendants' Neutrogena sunscreen products (identified above) have been independently tested and shown to be adulterated with Benzene, a known human carcinogen. The presence of Benzene in Defendants' Neutrogena Sunscreen Products was not disclosed in the products' label, in violation of state and federal law.”

The Plaintiff further alleged that, “Valisure tested numerous lots of Defendants' spray and lotion Sunscreen Products. Through its testing, Valisure discovered that certain of the Sunscreen Products contain Benzene, with values ranging from less than 0.1 parts per million ("ppm"), 0.10 ppm to 2 ppm, and more than 2 ppm. For reference, the National Institute for Occupational Safety and Health ("NIOSH") recommends protective equipment be worn by workers expecting to be exposed to Benzene at concentrations of 0.1 ppm and defines "skin absorption" as an exposure route.”

The Plaintiff also alleged that, “Benzene is classified as a human carcinogen, a substance that could potentially cause cancer depending on the level and extent of exposure” and “Defendants failed to properly warn consumers of the risks and dangers attendant to the use of Benzene in their sunscreen products – even well after Defendants knew or should have known of the Products’ hazards. Defendants continued to conceal the dangers of the Products until they issued a full recall of the Products.” The Plaintiff also alleged that, “Defendants knew, but failed to disclose to Plaintiff and the Class the danger of the Products.”

There are four claims of relief laid down by the Plaintiff, on behalf of herself and the class. The first claim alleged is for fraudulent concealment. The second claim is for the alleged violation of the Florida Deceptive and Unfair Trade Practices Act (“FDUTPA”) Fla. Stat. §§ 501.201 et seq. The third claim is for the alleged violation of the New Jersey Consumer Fraud Act (“CFA”) N.J.S.A. § 56:8-1, et seq. The fourth claim is for alleged unjust enrichment. 

In its prayer for relief, the Plaintiff requested the Court for an order certifying this action as a Class Action and naming the Plaintiff as the representative of the Class. The Plaintiff further requested the Court for declaratory and injunctive reliefs along with compensatory, statutory and punitive damages; an order of restitution; all other forms of equitable monetary relief; and reasonable attorneys’ fees and expenses and costs of suit.

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-17290

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Freda L. Wolfson

Referral Judge

Tonianne J. Bongiovanni

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARCY LOKIETZ

Defendants

JOHNSON & JOHNSON

NEUTROGENA CORPORATION

JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GARY S. GRAIFMAN

Attorney at KANTROWITZ, GOLDHAMER & GRAIFMAN, PC

135 Chestnut Ridge Road, Suite 200

Montvale, NJ 07645

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Summons

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

(#3) Order of MDL Panel (CTO-1) transferring case to the USDC for the FLSD. (dm ) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketCase transferred from New Jersey has been opened in Southern District of Florida as case 0:21-cv-62261, filed 11/01/2021. (km) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketCase electronically transferred to the USDC for the FLSD. (dm ) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order of MDL Panel (CTO-1) transferring case to the USDC for the FLSD. (dm ) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., NEUTROGENA CORPORATION. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mg, ) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketChief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (mg, ) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: In the future when choosing parties please choose each party individually. Do NOT select the ALL PLAINTIFFS or ALL DEFENDANTS button . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, ) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., NEUTROGENA CORPORATION. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12821046) with JURY DEMAND, filed by MARY LOKIETZ. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(GRAIFMAN, GARY) Modified on 9/22/2021 (mg). (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less