This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/11/2022 at 07:14:17 (UTC).

Konstantine Panagiotis Lois et al v. Benjamin Joseph Levin et al

Case Summary

On 02/10/2022 Konstantine Panagiotis Lois filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Benjamin Joseph Levin. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Stephen V. Wilson and Autumn D. Spaeth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00926

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stephen V. Wilson

Referral Judge

Autumn D. Spaeth

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Konstantine Panagiotis Lois

Shane Jarret Williams

Defendants

Benjamin Joseph Levin

Ashley Nicolette Frangipane

Nathan Perez

Khalid Donnel Robinson

Edward Christopher Sheeran

Friends Keep Secrets, Inc.

UMG Recordings, Inc. Guardian Ad Litem d/b/a Interscope Records

DOES 1 through 10, inclusive,

UMG Recordings, Inc. doing business as Interscope Records

Does 1 through 10, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Steven T. Lowe

Attorney at Lowe and Associates PC

8383 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1038

Beverly Hills, CA 90211

Naomi Manea Sarega

Attorney at Higbee and Associates

1504 Brookhollow Drive Suite 112

Santa Ana, CA 92705

Ryan E Carreon

Attorney at Higbee and Associates

1504 Brookhollow Drive Suite 112

Santa Ana, CA 92705

Mathew K Higbee

Attorney at Higbee and Associates

1504 Brookhollow Drive Suite 112

Santa Ana, CA 92705

 

Court Documents

#26

(#26) NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

#25

(#25) ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE Pursuant General Order 21-01 (identical case) by Judge Josephine L. Staton, Case Management and Assignment Committee Chair. Case transferred to the calendar of Judge Stephen V. Wilson for all further proceedings. All discovery matters are transferred to Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. Case number now reads as 2:22-cv-00926 SVW(ADSx). (rn) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

#24

(#24) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): The incorrect case number of 2:21-cv-4305 is noted on the complaint. (car) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

#23

(#23) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant UMG Recordings, Inc. (car) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

#22

(#22) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Edward Christopher Sheeran. (car) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

#21

(#21) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Nathan Perez. (car) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

#20

(#20) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Khalid Donnel Robinson. (car) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

#19

(#19) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Ashley Nicolette Frangipane. (car) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

#18

(#18) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Friends Keep Secrets, Inc. (car) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

#9

(#9) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Konstantine Panagiotis Lois, Shane Jarret Williams. (Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

#8

(#8) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Konstantine Panagiotis Lois, Shane Jarret Williams. (Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

#7

(#7) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Konstantine Panagiotis Lois, Shane Jarret Williams. (Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

#6

(#6) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Konstantine Panagiotis Lois, Shane Jarret Williams. (Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

#5

(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Konstantine Panagiotis Lois, Shane Jarret Williams. (Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Konstantine Panagiotis Lois, Shane Jarret Williams, identifying None. (Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

#3

(#3) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Konstantine Panagiotis Lois, Shane Jarret Williams. (Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Konstantine Panagiotis Lois, Shane Jarret Williams. (Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

#1

(#17) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Benjamin Joseph Levin. (car) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE Pursuant General Order 21-01 (identical case) by Judge Josephine L. Staton, Case Management and Assignment Committee Chair. Case transferred to the calendar of Judge Stephen V. Wilson for all further proceedings. All discovery matters are transferred to Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. Case number now reads as 2:22-cv-00926 SVW(ADSx). (rn) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): The incorrect case number of 2:21-cv-4305 is noted on the complaint. (car) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant UMG Recordings, Inc. (car) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Edward Christopher Sheeran. (car) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Nathan Perez. (car) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Khalid Donnel Robinson. (car) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Ashley Nicolette Frangipane. (car) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Friends Keep Secrets, Inc. (car) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Benjamin Joseph Levin. (car) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Konstantine Panagiotis Lois, Shane Jarret Williams. (Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Konstantine Panagiotis Lois, Shane Jarret Williams. (Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Konstantine Panagiotis Lois, Shane Jarret Williams. (Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Konstantine Panagiotis Lois, Shane Jarret Williams. (Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Konstantine Panagiotis Lois, Shane Jarret Williams. (Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Konstantine Panagiotis Lois, Shane Jarret Williams. (Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Konstantine Panagiotis Lois, Shane Jarret Williams, identifying None. (Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Konstantine Panagiotis Lois, Shane Jarret Williams. (Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Konstantine Panagiotis Lois, Shane Jarret Williams. (Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32770523 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiffs Shane Jarret Williams, Konstantine Panagiotis Lois. (Attorney Mathew K Higbee added to party Konstantine Panagiotis Lois(pty:pla), Attorney Mathew K Higbee added to party Shane Jarret Williams(pty:pla))(Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UMG Recordings, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Naomi Manea Sarega

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven T Lowe

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mathew K Higbee