This case was last updated from PACER on 10/21/2019 at 07:13:12 (UTC).

LOIRE v. AHRENDT et al

Case Summary

On 08/22/2019 a Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee case was filed by LOIRE against AHRENDT in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-17068

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Susan D. Wigenton

 

Party Details

Petitioner

STEVEN ANOURAK LOIRE

Defendants

US Attorney General WILLIAM P. BARR

WARDEN STEVEN AHRENDT

ACTING SECRETARY DHS KEVIN K MCALEENAN

Field Office Dir. THOMAS R. DECKER

Respondents

KEVIN K MCALEENAN

WILLIAM P. BARR

THOMAS R. DECKER

STEVEN AHRENDT

 

Court Documents

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) ORDER TO ANSWER, that Respondents Decker, McAleenan, and Barr are dismissed with prejudice as the sloe proper respondent in a petition is the Warden of the facility where the detainee is currently held, in this case the remaining Respondent Steven Ahrendt. It is further Ordered that the Clerk of the Court shall serve copies of the Petition (ECF No. 1) and this Order, upon Respondent Steven Ahrendt by regular mail, with all costs of service advanced by the United States, etc. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 8/26/2019. (JB, ) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) RESPONSE to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by STEVEN AHRENDT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Order of the Immigration Judge, #2 Declaration of Elizabeth Burgus)(HAJDARPASIC, ENES) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Substitution of Attorney - Attorney JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN terminated. Attorney ENES HAJDARPASIC for STEVEN AHRENDT added.. (HAJDARPASIC, ENES) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER TO ANSWER, that Respondents Decker, McAleenan, and Barr are dismissed with prejudice as the sloe proper respondent in a petition is the Warden of the facility where the detainee is currently held, in this case the remaining Respondent Steven Ahrendt. It is further Ordered that the Clerk of the Court shall serve copies of the Petition (ECF No. 1) and this Order, upon Respondent Steven Ahrendt by regular mail, with all costs of service advanced by the United States, etc. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 8/26/2019. (JB, ) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • Case Assigned to Judge Susan D. Wigenton. (ak, ) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE by Steven Anourak Loire re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, Civil Cover Sheet (TAJ, NABILA) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 0312-9912616.), filed by Steven Anourak Loire. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Form I-863, Notice of Referral to Immigration Judge, #2 Exhibit B - Case Processing Times for U Nonimmigrant Status, #3 Exhibit C - Letter from U.S. DOJ Solicitor General, Re: Demore, #4 Exhibit D - Mr. Loire's High School Diploma)(TAJ, NABILA) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.