Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 01/25/2020 at 07:27:57 (UTC).

Logsdon v. The Hartford et al

Case Summary

On 11/26/2019 Logsdon filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against The Hartford. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Rebecca Grady Jennings and Regina S. Edwards. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00869

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rebecca Grady Jennings

Referral Judge

Regina S. Edwards

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Melanie Logsdon

Defendants

The Hartford

Benefits Management Services

BB&T Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert A. Florio

1500 Story Avenue

Louisville, KY 40206

Defendant Attorneys

William B. Wahlheim, Jr.

Attorney at Maynard Cooper & Gale PC - Birminhgam

1901 Sixth Avenue North, Suite 2400

Birmingham, AL 35203-2618

Braxton S. Thrash

Attorney at Maynard Cooper & Gale PC - Birminhgam

1901 Sixth Avenue North, Suite 2400

Birmingham, AL 35203-2618

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT (EBOC) by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 1/15/2020: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 3/2/2020 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards. cc: counsel (JM) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#16

(#16) ORDER Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 1/9/2020 granting #13 Motion for Attorney Braxton S. Thrash to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel (JM) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#15

(#15) ORDER Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 1/9/2020 granting #12 Motion for Attorney William B. Wahleim, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel(JM) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

13 #3

Proposed Order

13 #2

Exhibit A Certificate of Good Standing

13 #1

Exhibit 1 Affidavit of Braxton S. Thrash

#13

(#13) MOTION for Braxton S. Thrash to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3016804. by Defendants BB&T Corporation, The Hartford (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Affidavit of Braxton S. Thrash, #2 Exhibit A Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Thrash, Braxton) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

12 #3

Proposed Order

12 #2

Exhibit A Certificate of Good Standing

12 #1

Exhibit 1 Affidavit of William Wahlheim

#12

(#12) MOTION for William B. Wahlheim, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3016611. by Defendants BB&T Corporation, The Hartford (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Affidavit of William Wahlheim, #2 Exhibit A Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Wahlheim, William) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#11

(#11) ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency issued to Attorney William B. Wahlheim, Jr. re #9 Answer to Complaint. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 1/22/2020. (JM) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#10

(#10) ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency issued to Attorney Braxton S. Thrash re #9 Answer to Complaint. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 1/22/2020. (JM) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to Complaint by BB&T Corporation, The Hartford. (Wahlheim, William) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 1/7/2020 granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Defendants' responsive pleading is due 1/7/2020. cc: Counsel (JM) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

7 #1

Proposed Order

#7

(#7) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants BB&T Corporation, The Hartford (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Wahlheim, William) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

#5

(#5) Proposed Agreed Order and Stipulation to Extend Responsive Pleading Deadline by BB&T Corporation, The Hartford by BB&T Corporation, The Hartford. (Wahlheim, William) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT (EBOC) by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 1/15/2020: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 3/2/2020 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards. cc: counsel (JM) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 1/9/2020 granting #13 Motion for Attorney Braxton S. Thrash to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel (JM) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 1/9/2020 granting #12 Motion for Attorney William B. Wahleim, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel(JM) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • (#14) TEXT ORDER by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 1/9/2020; pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is REFERRED to U.S. Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards for resolution of all litigation planning issues, a scheduling conference, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Edwards is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. A separate order scheduling the Rule 16 Conference will be issued by the Chambers of United States Magistrate Judge Edwards. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel,CM-RSE. (ARM) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MOTION for Braxton S. Thrash to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3016804. by Defendants BB&T Corporation, The Hartford (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Affidavit of Braxton S. Thrash, #2 Exhibit A Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Thrash, Braxton) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION for William B. Wahlheim, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3016611. by Defendants BB&T Corporation, The Hartford (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Affidavit of William Wahlheim, #2 Exhibit A Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Wahlheim, William) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency issued to Attorney William B. Wahlheim, Jr. re #9 Answer to Complaint. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 1/22/2020. (JM) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency issued to Attorney Braxton S. Thrash re #9 Answer to Complaint. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 1/22/2020. (JM) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER to Complaint by BB&T Corporation, The Hartford. (Wahlheim, William) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 1/7/2020 granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Defendants' responsive pleading is due 1/7/2020. cc: Counsel (JM) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants BB&T Corporation, The Hartford (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Wahlheim, William) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 12/5/2019 granting #5 Proposed Agreed Order. Defendants' responsive pleading deadline is 12/24/2019. cc: Counsel (RLJ) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Proposed Agreed Order and Stipulation to Extend Responsive Pleading Deadline by BB&T Corporation, The Hartford by BB&T Corporation, The Hartford. (Wahlheim, William) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal from Jefferson Circuit Court, Civil Action Number 19-CI-006299. cc: Counsel; Jefferson Circuit Court (ALS) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (ALS) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc., Delaware, Other Affiliate Hartford Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Hartford Life, Inc. for The Hartford. (ALS) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by BB&T Corporation, The Hartford from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-06922. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0644-2993109) filed by BB&T Corporation, The Hartford. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - state court documents) (ALS) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BB & T BANK 21657 is a litigant

Latest cases where The Hartford is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert A. Florio