This case was last updated from PACER on 10/21/2019 at 07:13:21 (UTC).

LOGISTIC ALLIANCE SERVICES, LLC v. LA BOUCHERIE USA CORP. et al

Case Summary

On 08/22/2019 a Property - Personal Property Fraud case was filed by LOGISTIC ALLIANCE SERVICES, LLC against LA BOUCHERIE USA CORP in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-17071

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Stanley R. Chesler

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOGISTIC ALLIANCE SERVICES, LLC

Defendants

RODRIGO M. DUARTE

CASEIRO GOURMET HOUSE, CORP.

LA BOUCHERIE USA CORP.

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by LOGISTIC ALLIANCE SERVICES, LLC. (CONDON, BRIAN) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

#8

(#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in a Civil Case, Civil Cover Sheet with Complaint and Jury Demand served on Rodrigo Duarte on 09/04/19, filed by LOGISTIC ALLIANCE SERVICES, LLC. (CONDON, BRIAN) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

#5

(#5) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by LOGISTIC ALLIANCE SERVICES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Corporation and LLC Annual Reports)(CONDON, BRIAN) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against LA BOUCHERIE USA CORP., RODRIGO M. DUARTE, : and CASEIRO GOURMET HOUSE, CORP. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9912935) with JURY DEMAND, filed by LOGISTIC ALLIANCE SERVICES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(CONDON, BRIAN) Modified on 8/23/2019 (qa, ). (Entered: 08/22/2019)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to CASEIRO GOURMET HOUSE, CORP., RODRIGO M. DUARTE, LA BOUCHERIE USA CORP.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (qa, ) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

#4

(#4) *** DISCHARGED *** ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE that Plaintiff shall show cause in writing before the undersigned by Wednesday, 9/11/2019 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. etc. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 8/28/2019. (dam, ) Modified on 9/11/2019 (dam, ). (Entered: 08/28/2019)

#9

(#9) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in a Civil Case, Civil Cover Sheet with Complaint and Jury Demand served on Caseiro Gourmet House Corp. c/a/ on 09/04/19, filed by LOGISTIC ALLIANCE SERVICES, LLC. (CONDON, BRIAN) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

5 #1

Exhibit Corporation and LLC Annual Reports

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#6

(#6) ORDER that the #4 Order to Show Cause be and hereby is DISCHARGED. etc. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 9/11/2019. (dam, ) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

#7

(#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in a Civil Case, Civil Cover Sheet with Complaint and Jury Demand served on La Boucherie USA Corp c/o Rodrigo Duarte on 09/04/19, filed by LOGISTIC ALLIANCE SERVICES, LLC. (CONDON, BRIAN) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

#10

(#10) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in a Civil Case, Civil Cover Sheet with Complaint and Jury Demand served on La Boucherie USA Corp c/o Rodrigo Duarte on 09/04/19, filed by LOGISTIC ALLIANCE SERVICES, LLC. (CONDON, BRIAN) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in a Civil Case, Civil Cover Sheet with Complaint and Jury Demand served on La Boucherie USA Corp c/o Rodrigo Duarte on 09/04/19, filed by LOGISTIC ALLIANCE SERVICES, LLC. (CONDON, BRIAN) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in a Civil Case, Civil Cover Sheet with Complaint and Jury Demand served on Caseiro Gourmet House Corp. c/a/ on 09/04/19, filed by LOGISTIC ALLIANCE SERVICES, LLC. (CONDON, BRIAN) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in a Civil Case, Civil Cover Sheet with Complaint and Jury Demand served on Rodrigo Duarte on 09/04/19, filed by LOGISTIC ALLIANCE SERVICES, LLC. (CONDON, BRIAN) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in a Civil Case, Civil Cover Sheet with Complaint and Jury Demand served on La Boucherie USA Corp c/o Rodrigo Duarte on 09/04/19, filed by LOGISTIC ALLIANCE SERVICES, LLC. (CONDON, BRIAN) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER that the #4 Order to Show Cause be and hereby is DISCHARGED. etc. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 9/11/2019. (dam, ) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by LOGISTIC ALLIANCE SERVICES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Corporation and LLC Annual Reports)(CONDON, BRIAN) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) *** DISCHARGED *** ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE that Plaintiff shall show cause in writing before the undersigned by Wednesday, 9/11/2019 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. etc. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 8/28/2019. (dam, ) Modified on 9/11/2019 (dam, ). (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to CASEIRO GOURMET HOUSE, CORP., RODRIGO M. DUARTE, LA BOUCHERIE USA CORP.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (qa, ) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • Case Assigned to Judge Stanley R. Chesler and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. (ak, ) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by LOGISTIC ALLIANCE SERVICES, LLC. (CONDON, BRIAN) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against LA BOUCHERIE USA CORP., RODRIGO M. DUARTE, : and CASEIRO GOURMET HOUSE, CORP. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9912935) with JURY DEMAND, filed by LOGISTIC ALLIANCE SERVICES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(CONDON, BRIAN) Modified on 8/23/2019 (qa, ). (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.