This case was last updated from PACER on 10/11/2020 at 10:59:59 (UTC).

Loggins v. Metro Mobile

Case Summary

On 08/12/2020 Loggins filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Metro Mobile. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Dakota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Alice R. Senechal and Peter D. Welte. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00146

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Dakota District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Alice R. Senechal

Presiding Judge

Peter D. Welte

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jonathan Loggins

Defendant

Metro Mobile

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #3 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Mail NOT resent to Jonathan Loggins. (js) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

#10

(#10) Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #2 Notice of Direct Assignment. Mail NOT resent to Jonathan Loggins. (js) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

#9

(#9) CLERK'S JUDGMENT against Jonathan Loggins. (pb) Distributed on 9/18/2020 (pb). (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte adopting #6 Report and Recommendations. (MK) Distributed on 9/17/2020 (pb). (Entered: 09/17/2020)

#6

(#6) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal recommending the #4 Complaint filed by Jonathan Loggins be dismissed. (Objections to R&R due by 9/16/2020). (AS) Distributed on 9/2/2020 (pb). (Entered: 09/02/2020)

#5

(#5) SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Jonathan Loggins. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/8/2020. (pb) Distributed on 8/31/2020 (pb). (Entered: 08/31/2020)

#3

(#3) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The filing fee is waived. (AS) Distributed on 8/13/2020 (pb). (Entered: 08/13/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Jonathan Loggins. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/26/2020. (js) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

1 #1

Proposed Complaint & js 44

#1

(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jonathan Loggins. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint & js 44)(js) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #3 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Mail NOT resent to Jonathan Loggins. (js) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #2 Notice of Direct Assignment. Mail NOT resent to Jonathan Loggins. (js) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CLERK'S JUDGMENT against Jonathan Loggins. (pb) Distributed on 9/18/2020 (pb). (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte adopting #6 Report and Recommendations. (MK) Distributed on 9/17/2020 (pb). (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • Docket(#7) (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Chief Judge Peter D. Welte, as presiding judge, and Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal, as referral judge, for all further proceeding by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal no longer assigned as presiding judge. (pb) Distributed on 9/2/2020 (pb). (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal recommending the #4 Complaint filed by Jonathan Loggins be dismissed. (Objections to R&R due by 9/16/2020). (AS) Distributed on 9/2/2020 (pb). (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Jonathan Loggins. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/8/2020. (pb) Distributed on 8/31/2020 (pb). (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) COMPLAINT against Metro Mobile (Filing fee: IFP) filed by Jonathan Loggins. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pb) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The filing fee is waived. (AS) Distributed on 8/13/2020 (pb). (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Jonathan Loggins. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/26/2020. (js) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jonathan Loggins. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint & js 44)(js) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less