Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/26/2021 at 08:57:45 (UTC).

LoganTree LP v. LG Electronics, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On April 27, 2021, LoganTree LP (“LoganTree” or “Plaintiff”), represented by Hossain Arnold Shokouhi and James Eamonn Sherry of McCathern, PLLC-Dallas, filed an intellectual property lawsuit against LG Electronics, Inc. (“LG Korea”), and LG Electronics USA, Inc. (“LG USA”) (collectively, “LG” or “Defendants”), seeking declaratory and monetary relief, along with treble damages, for the alleged infringement of Reexamined U.S. Patent No. 6,059,576 (“the ‘576 Patent”), entitled “Training and Safety Device, System and Method to Aid in Proper Movement During Physical Activity,” owned by the Plaintiff. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Texas with Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III presiding. 

 

In its complaint, the Plaintiff alleged that “LG, directly or through intermediaries, makes, made, has made, used, imported, manufactured, provided, supplied, distributed, sold, and/or offered for sale to customers within the United States accelerometer-based activity monitoring devices that infringe the Reexamined ‘576 Patent either literally and/or under the doctrine of equivalents, including but not limited to the following models of wearable accelerometer-based activity tracker: LG Watch Sport family, LG Watch Style family, and LG Watch Urbane family (collectively “Accused Products”).”

 

The Plaintiff further alleged that “The Accused Products infringe the Reexamined ‘576 Patent because each of the Accused Products is a portable, self-contained device that uses an accelerometer to measure the angle and velocity of body movements, a user-programmable microprocessor capable of recognizing and analyzing data generated by the accelerometer, and internal memory and a clock for storing the data along with a timestamp.”

 

The Plaintiff also alleged that “Defendant has contributed to the infringement by third parties, including its customers, of one or more claims of the ‘576 Patent under 35 U.S.C. § 271(c), by selling and/or offering for sale in the United States knowing that those products constitute a material part of the inventions of the ‘576 Patent, knowing that those products are especially made or adapted to infringe the ’576 Patent, and knowing that those products are not staple articles of commerce suitable for substantial non-infringing use.”

 

The only claim for relief laid down by the Plaintiff is for the alleged infringement of Reexamined ‘576 Patent by the Defendants, wherein, the Plaintiff claimed that, Defendant has actively, knowingly, and intentionally induced, infringement of the ‘576 Patent by selling or otherwise supplying the Accused Products with the knowledge and intent that third parties will use, sell, and/or offer for sale in the United States, for their intended purpose to infringe the ‘576 Patent, and with the knowledge and intent to encourage and facilitate infringement through the dissemination of the Accused Products and/or the creation and dissemination of documentation and technical information to customers and prospective customers related to the Accused Products, as well actively providing Defendant’s app for use by customers with the Accused Products.

 

In its prayer for relief, the Plaintiff requested the Court to adjudicate that Defendants have directly infringed the Reexamined ‘576 Patent under 35 U.S.C. § 271(a), and order Defendants to pay damages adequate to compensate Plaintiff for Defendants’ infringement, together with pre-judgment and post-judgment interests, in an amount according to proof. The Plaintiff further requested the court to enter a judgment that the infringement was willful and that such damages be trebled pursuant to 35 U.S.C. § 284.

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.




Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00332

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Amos L. Mazzant, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LoganTree LP

Defendants

LG Electronics, Inc.

LG Electronics USA, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Hossain Arnold Shokouhi

Attorney at McCathern, PLLC - Dallas

3710 Rawlins Street, Suite 1600

Dallas, TX 75219

James Eamonn Sherry

Attorney at McCathern, PLLC - Dallas

3710 Rawlins Street, Suite 1600

Dallas, TX 75219

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 5/19/2021. (rpc, ) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

6 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#6

(#6) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by defendants by LoganTree LP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shokouhi, Hossain) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by LoganTree LP. LG Electronics USA, Inc. served on 4/29/2021, answer due 5/20/2021. (Shokouhi, Hossain) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Issued as to LG Electronics USA, Inc. (rpc, ) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Issued as to LG Electronics, Inc. (rpc, ) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Shokouhi, Hossain) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8381559.), filed by LoganTree LP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Shokouhi, Hossain) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketAnswer Due Deadline Updated for LG Electronics USA, Inc. to 8/18/2021; LG Electronics, Inc. to 8/18/2021. (rpc, ) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 5/19/2021. (rpc, ) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by defendants by LoganTree LP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shokouhi, Hossain) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by LoganTree LP. LG Electronics USA, Inc. served on 4/29/2021, answer due 5/20/2021. (Shokouhi, Hossain) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Issued as to LG Electronics USA, Inc. (rpc, ) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Issued as to LG Electronics, Inc. (rpc, ) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, ) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (rpc, ) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Shokouhi, Hossain) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8381559.), filed by LoganTree LP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Shokouhi, Hossain) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LoganTree LP is a litigant

Latest cases where LG ELECTRONICS U.S.A., INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James Eamonn Sherry

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hossain Arnold Shokouhi