This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/17/2022 at 07:33:44 (UTC).

Logan et al v. Safety-Kleen Systems, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 02/16/2022 Logan filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Safety-Kleen Systems, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Joan M. Azrack and Steven I. Locke. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00868

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joan M. Azrack

Referral Judge

Steven I. Locke

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Craig Logan

Love Williams

Thomas Murphy

Kevin Miller

Andrew Tyson

Louis Wells

Clarence Fisher

Robert Reid

Defendants

Safety-Kleen Systems, Inc.

Clean Harbors, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Samuel

1441 Broadway, Suite 6085

New York, NY 10018

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Clean Harbors, Inc., Safety-Kleen Systems, Inc. filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15297484 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Louis Wells, Thomas Murphy, Clarence Fisher, Love Williams, Robert Reid, Craig Logan, Kevin Miller, Andrew Tyson. (Samuel, Michael) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

#2

(#2) Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, by Clarence Fisher, Craig Logan, Kevin Miller, Thomas Murphy, Robert Reid, Andrew Tyson, Louis Wells, Love Williams (Samuel, Michael) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

3 #3

Main Document

3 #1

Additional Corrections

#4

(#4) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Clarence Fisher, Craig Logan, Kevin Miller, Thomas Murphy, Robert Reid, Andrew Tyson, Louis Wells, Love Williams (Samuel, Michael) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

#5

(#5) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Clarence Fisher, Craig Logan, Kevin Miller, Thomas Murphy, Robert Reid, Andrew Tyson, Louis Wells, Love Williams (Samuel, Michael) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

#6

(#6) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Landow, Concetta) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

7 #7

Main Document

7 #1

Summons #2

#8

(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Louis Wells, Thomas Murphy, Clarence Fisher, Love Williams, Robert Reid, Craig Logan, Kevin Miller, Andrew Tyson. Safety-Kleen Systems, Inc. waiver sent on 3/30/2022, answer due 5/29/2022. (Samuel, Michael) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Louis Wells, Thomas Murphy, Clarence Fisher, Love Williams, Robert Reid, Craig Logan, Kevin Miller, Andrew Tyson. Safety-Kleen Systems, Inc. waiver sent on 3/30/2022, answer due 5/29/2022. (Samuel, Michael) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons #2) (Landow, Concetta) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Landow, Concetta) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Landow, Concetta) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Clarence Fisher, Craig Logan, Kevin Miller, Thomas Murphy, Robert Reid, Andrew Tyson, Louis Wells, Love Williams (Samuel, Michael) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Clarence Fisher, Craig Logan, Kevin Miller, Thomas Murphy, Robert Reid, Andrew Tyson, Louis Wells, Love Williams (Samuel, Michael) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/16/2022: #1 Additional Corrections) (Landow, Concetta). (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, by Clarence Fisher, Craig Logan, Kevin Miller, Thomas Murphy, Robert Reid, Andrew Tyson, Louis Wells, Love Williams (Samuel, Michael) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Clean Harbors, Inc., Safety-Kleen Systems, Inc. filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15297484 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Louis Wells, Thomas Murphy, Clarence Fisher, Love Williams, Robert Reid, Craig Logan, Kevin Miller, Andrew Tyson. (Samuel, Michael) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CLEAN HARBORS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Safety-Kleen Systems Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Samuel