This case was last updated from PACER on 08/18/2021 at 07:27:57 (UTC).

Logan et al v. Johnson & Johnson et al

Case Summary

On 08/17/2021 Logan filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Johnson Johnson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Freda L. Wolfson and Lois H. Goodman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-15441

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Freda L. Wolfson

Referral Judge

Lois H. Goodman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Samuel D. Logan

Samuel R. Logan

Jennifer Logan

Defendants

JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC

Johnson & Johnson

Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies Inc

IMERYS TALC AMERICAN INC.

In Re

JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Miriam Ruth Bourdette

Attorney at Bourdette & Partners

2924 W. Main Street

Visalia, CA 93291

Philip C. Bourdette

Attorney at Bourdette & Partners

2924 W. Main Street

Visalia, CA 93291

Defendant Attorneys

Michael C. Zellers

Attorney at Tucker Ellis & West LLP

515 S. Flower St., 42Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2223

SCOTT A. JAMES

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

600 Travis Street, Suite 3400

Houston, TX 77002-2926

Emily M Weissenberger

Attorney at Shook Hardy and Bacon LLP

One Montgomery Suite 2600

San Francisco, CA 94104

Amanda Villalobos

Attorney at Tucker Ellis LLP

515 South Flower Street 42Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2223

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. JAMES on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC, Johnson & Johnson (JAMES, SCOTT) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

6 #1

*Restricted*

#6

(#6) Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of California Eastern; Case Number 1:21-cv-01139. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 08/17/2021)

#5

(#5) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-269), CASE TRANSFERRED to District of New Jersey. MDL NO. 2738. (Gonzalez, R) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

#4

(#4) ANSWER with Jury Demand by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc..(Weissenberger, Emily) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

3 #4

VDRP

3 #3

Consent Form

3 #2

Standing Order re Judicial Emergency

3 #1

Standing Order

#3

(#3) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 9/28/2021 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Flores, E) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal,. (Weissenberger, Emily) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

1 #8

Notice of Pendency or Other Actions or Proceedings

1 #7

Notice of Interested Parties

1 #6

Exhibit D

1 #5

Exhibit C

1 #4

Exhibit B

1 #2

Declaration of Emily Weissenberger ISO Removal

#1

(#1) NOTICE of REMOVAL from Tulare County Superior Court, case number VCU-274061 by Jennifer Logan, Samuel D. Logan, Samuel R. Logan. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-9732385) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of Emily Weissenberger ISO Removal, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Notice of Interested Parties, #8 Notice of Pendency or Other Actions or Proceedings)(Weissenberger, Emily) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketChief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (jal, ) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. JAMES on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC, Johnson & Johnson (JAMES, SCOTT) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of California Eastern; Case Number 1:21-cv-01139. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-269), CASE TRANSFERRED to District of New Jersey. MDL NO. 2738. (Gonzalez, R) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER with Jury Demand by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc..(Weissenberger, Emily) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 9/28/2021 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Flores, E) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal,. (Weissenberger, Emily) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of REMOVAL from Tulare County Superior Court, case number VCU-274061 by Jennifer Logan, Samuel D. Logan, Samuel R. Logan. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-9732385) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of Emily Weissenberger ISO Removal, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Notice of Interested Parties, #8 Notice of Pendency or Other Actions or Proceedings)(Weissenberger, Emily) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC. ("IMERYS TALC") is a litigant

Latest cases where Johnson & Johnson is a litigant