This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/13/2022 at 07:20:53 (UTC).

Lofton v. Greene et al

Case Summary

On 12/15/2021 Lofton filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Greene. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Central District. The Judge overseeing this case is James E. Shadid. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-03265

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James E. Shadid

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Franklin Lofton

Mt Sterling, IL 62353

Defendants

Brittany Greene

. Trusewych

. Smith

. Bowman

. Adams

. Clarkson

. Winfield

Jane Doe

John Doe

. Hays

. Ashcraft

Wexford Health Sources Inc

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Franklin Lofton.(SAG) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

#3

(#3) PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Franklin Lofton.(SAG) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

#4

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Franklin Lofton. Responses due by 12/29/2021 (SAG) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

2 #2

Main Document

2 #1

Notice Regarding Privacy Issues

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketPrisoner Initial Partial Filing Fee received 1/14/2022, in the amount of $ 29.12; receipt number 44626004001 (RES) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ORDER granting #3 Petition to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b)(1), Plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $29.12. The agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to forward the initial partial filing fee from Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of Court within 30 days of this order. After payment of the initial partial filing fee (or immediately if no funds are available for that payment) the agency having custody of Plaintiff shall make monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding month's income credited to Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of Court. Income includes all deposits from any source, including gifts. The agency having custody of the plaintiff shall forward these payments each time Plaintiff's account exceeds $10, until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff's place of confinement, to the attention of the Trust Fund Office, and to Plaintiff. Entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 12/16/2021. (SAG) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge James Shadid. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Peoria Division, 100 NE Monroe Street, Peoria, IL 61602. Merit Review Deadline set for 1/5/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(SAG) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Franklin Lofton. Responses due by 12/29/2021 (SAG) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER by Franklin Lofton (SAG) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Franklin Lofton.(SAG) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Franklin Lofton.(SAG) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CLARKSON is a litigant

Latest cases where ASHCRAFT COMPANY (ROE 1) is a litigant

Latest cases where HAYS COMPANIES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where BOWMAN is a litigant