This case was last updated from PACER on 09/07/2021 at 08:31:10 (UTC).

Lodati et al v. Friends Academy et al

Case Summary

On 07/09/2021 Lodati filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Friends Academy. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Eric N. Vitaliano and Anne Y. Shields. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-03875

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Eric N. Vitaliano

Referral Judge

Anne Y. Shields

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stephanie Lodati

Defendants

Friends Academy

The Board Of Trustee of Friends Academy

Andrea Kelly

Mark Schoeffel

Carolyn Skudder-Pocius

Jozeph Herceg

Ron Baskind

Pamela Martocci

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Keith Altman

Attorney at The Law Office of Keith Altman

33228 West 12 Mile Road, Ste 375

Farmington Hills, MI 48334

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Landow, Concetta) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

11 #1

Additional Corrections

11 #11

Main Document

#11

No Description Available

#10

(#10) Proposed Summons. by Jane Doe, John Doe, Stephanie Lodati (Altman, Keith) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

#9

(#9) Proposed Summons. by Jane Doe, John Doe, Stephanie Lodati (Altman, Keith) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

#8

(#8) Proposed Summons. by Jane Doe, John Doe, Stephanie Lodati (Altman, Keith) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

#7

(#7) Proposed Summons. by Jane Doe, John Doe, Stephanie Lodati (Altman, Keith) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

#6

(#6) Proposed Summons. by Jane Doe, John Doe, Stephanie Lodati (Altman, Keith) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

#5

(#5) Proposed Summons. by Jane Doe, John Doe, Stephanie Lodati (Altman, Keith) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

#4

(#4) Proposed Summons. by Jane Doe, John Doe, Stephanie Lodati (Altman, Keith) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

#3

(#3) Proposed Summons. by Jane Doe, John Doe, Stephanie Lodati (Altman, Keith) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

#2

(#2) Civil Cover Sheet.. by Jane Doe, John Doe, Stephanie Lodati (Altman, Keith) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Damages, Jury Trial Demanded against All Defendants filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14642864 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Stephani Lodati, Stephanie Lodati, Stephanie Lodati. (Altman, Keith) Modified on 7/12/2021 (Landow, Concetta). (Entered: 07/09/2021)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Landow, Concetta) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketYour proposed summons was not issued for one of the following reasons: The name on the summons does not match the name as it appears on the complaint. If it does not fit, you must attach a rider. Also, please leave date blank.Please correct and resubmit using Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Landow, Concetta) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Eric N. Vitaliano and Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Landow, Concetta) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/13/2021: #1 Additional Corrections) (Landow, Concetta). (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Proposed Summons. by Jane Doe, John Doe, Stephanie Lodati (Altman, Keith) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Proposed Summons. by Jane Doe, John Doe, Stephanie Lodati (Altman, Keith) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Proposed Summons. by Jane Doe, John Doe, Stephanie Lodati (Altman, Keith) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Proposed Summons. by Jane Doe, John Doe, Stephanie Lodati (Altman, Keith) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Proposed Summons. by Jane Doe, John Doe, Stephanie Lodati (Altman, Keith) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Proposed Summons. by Jane Doe, John Doe, Stephanie Lodati (Altman, Keith) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Proposed Summons. by Jane Doe, John Doe, Stephanie Lodati (Altman, Keith) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Proposed Summons. by Jane Doe, John Doe, Stephanie Lodati (Altman, Keith) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Civil Cover Sheet.. by Jane Doe, John Doe, Stephanie Lodati (Altman, Keith) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketNotice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. All questions *** INCLUDING the CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY*** section on the second page needs to be answered. Please submit Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Damages, Jury Trial Demanded against All Defendants filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14642864 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Stephani Lodati, Stephanie Lodati, Stephanie Lodati. (Altman, Keith) Modified on 7/12/2021 (Landow, Concetta). (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Board of Trustees of the Southern California Sheet Metal Industry Labor Management Cooperation Trust is a litigant