This case was last updated from PACER on 05/18/2021 at 01:36:06 (UTC).

In Re: Lockwood

Case Summary

On 02/10/2021 In Re Lockwood was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Charles Eskridge. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00456

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles Eskridge

 

Party Details

Appellant

Michael Lockwood

Appellees

GlassRatner Advisory & Capital Group LLC

Mark Shapiro

In Re

Lockwood Holdings, Inc.

Interested Party

B. Riley Financial, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Johnie J Patterson, II

Attorney at Walker & Patterson

P O Box 61301

Houston, TX 77208-1301

In Re and Appellee Attorneys

Jason S Brookner

Attorney at Gray Reed & McGraw LLP

1601 Elm Street, Suite 4600

Dallas, TX 75201

Lydia Rogers Webb

Attorney at Gray Reed McGraw LLP

1601 Elm Street, Ste 4600

Dallas, TX 75201

Amber Michelle Carson

Attorney at Gray Reed

1601 Elm St, Ste 4600

Dallas, TX 75201

Micheal W Bishop

Attorney at Gray Reed & McGraw LLP

4600 Thanksgiving Tower, 1601 Elm Street

Dallas, TX 75201

Interested Party Attorney

John P Melko

Attorney at Foley & Lardner LLP

1000 Louisiana Street, Suite 2000

Houston, TX 77002-2099

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #13 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (jdav, 4) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

#13

RESTRICTED

#12

(#12) AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Mark Shapiro and GlassRatner Capital & Advisory Group LLC / Jason S. Brookner for Transcript of Motion Hearing on 04/05/21 before Judge Eskridge. Expedited (7 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Veritext Legal Solutions, filed. (Brookner, Jason) Electronically forwarded to Veritext Legal Solutions on April 8, 2021. Estimated completion date: April 15, 2021. Modified on 4/8/2021 (ClaudiaGutierrez, 4). (Entered: 04/07/2021)

#11

(#11) ORDER DENYING EMERGENCY MOTION TO STAY denying #2 Motion for Emergency. (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

6 #13

Proposed Order Exhibit M

6 #12

Exhibit L

6 #11

Exhibit K

6 #10

Exhibit J

6 #9

Exhibit I

6 #8

Exhibit H

6 #7

Exhibit G

6 #6

Exhibit F

2 #5

Exhibit E - Exhibits Admitted At Stay Hearing

2 #4

Exhibit D - Transcript Of Motion For Stay Hearing Before Bankruptcy Court

2 #3

Exhibit C - Transcript Of February 4, 2021 Hearing

2 #2

Exhibit B - Bankruptcy Court Order Denying Stay Pending Appeal

2 #1

Exhibit A - Bankruptcy Court Order

#2

(#2) EMERGENCY MOTION( Motion Docket Date 3/26/2021.), MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal by Michael Lockwood, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Bankruptcy Court Order, #2 Exhibit B - Bankruptcy Court Order Denying Stay Pending Appeal, #3 Exhibit C - Transcript Of February 4, 2021 Hearing, #4 Exhibit D - Transcript Of Motion For Stay Hearing Before Bankruptcy Court, #5 Exhibit E - Exhibits Admitted At Stay Hearing)(Patterson, Johnie) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

47 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #13 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (jdav, 4) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) TRANSCRIPT re: held on 04/05/21 before Judge Charles Eskridge. Court Reporter/Transcriber Veritext Legal Solutions. Ordering Party Gray Reed & McGraw LLP Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/14/2021., filed. (VeritextLegalSolutions, ) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Mark Shapiro and GlassRatner Capital & Advisory Group LLC / Jason S. Brookner for Transcript of Motion Hearing on 04/05/21 before Judge Eskridge. Expedited (7 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Veritext Legal Solutions, filed. (Brookner, Jason) Electronically forwarded to Veritext Legal Solutions on April 8, 2021. Estimated completion date: April 15, 2021. Modified on 4/8/2021 (ClaudiaGutierrez, 4). (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER DENYING EMERGENCY MOTION TO STAY denying #2 Motion for Emergency. (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute entry for proceedings before Judge Charles Eskridge. MOTION HEARING. Parties appeared in person. The Court heard argument on #2 the emergency motion by Appellant Michael Lockwood to stay pending appeal an order by the Bankruptcy Court to dismiss his recently filed state court action. Appellant's Exhibits 1 through 6 were admitted without objection. The motion was denied for reasons stated on the record. A brief order will follow. Appearances: Jason S Brookner and Matthew Bourda f/ Lockwood Holdings; Johnie J Patterson, II and Miriam Goott f/ Appellant; John P Melko f/ Interested Party. (ERO: used), filed.(jengonzalez, 4) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ENTRY re: The parties are advised that the Court doesn't presently intend to allow further witness testimony or evidence during the hearing set for 04/05/2021. Counsel should be prepared to present arguments on #2 the motion to stay and #6 the objections based on the record from the Bankruptcy Court. The Court may request and consider further information at its discretion., filed. (jengonzalez, 4) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Exhibit List by B. Riley Financial, Inc.(Melko, John) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ENTRY re: The parties are advised that the Court doesn't presently intend to allow further witness testimony or evidence during the hearing set for 04/05/2021. Counsel should be prepared to present arguments on #2 the motion to stay and #6 the objections based on the record from the Bankruptcy Court. The Court may request and consider further information at its discretion., filed. (jengonzalez, 4) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Hearing EXHIBITS re: #2 EMERGENCY MOTION MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal by Michael Lockwood, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #1, #2 Exhibit #2, #3 Exhibit #3, #4 Exhibit #4, #5 Exhibit #5, #6 Exhibit #6)(Patterson, Johnie) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Exhibit List and Witness List by GlassRatner Advisory & Capital Group LLC, Mark Shapiro (Attachments: #1 A, #2 B, #3 C, #4 D, #5 E, #6 F, #7 G, #8 H, #9 I, #10 J, #11 K, #12 L, #13 M, #14 N, #15 O)(Brookner, Jason) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) JOINDER in #6 Objections, B. Riley Financial, Inc.'s Joinder to Objection to Michael Lockwood's Emergency Motion for Stay Pending Appeal, filed by B. Riley Financial, Inc.. (Melko, John) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) OBJECTIONS to #2 EMERGENCY MOTION MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal , filed by GlassRatner Advisory & Capital Group LLC, Mark Shapiro. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Proposed Order Exhibit M)(Brookner, Jason) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketInitial Conference set for 5/13/2021 at 09:15 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Sam S Sheldon is terminated. Case inadvertently set for conference. (jengonzalez, 4) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCorrective Entry: #5 Order for Initial Conference - FORM, was recorded on the wrong docket., filed. (jengonzalez, 4) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 5/13/2021 at 09:15 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Sam S Sheldon. (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalezadi, 4) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER re: Motion Hearing set for 4/5/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8B before Judge Charles Eskridge.(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PROPOSED ORDER re: #2 EMERGENCY MOTION MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal, filed.(Patterson, Johnie) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) EMERGENCY MOTION( Motion Docket Date 3/26/2021.), MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal by Michael Lockwood, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Bankruptcy Court Order, #2 Exhibit B - Bankruptcy Court Order Denying Stay Pending Appeal, #3 Exhibit C - Transcript Of February 4, 2021 Hearing, #4 Exhibit D - Transcript Of Motion For Stay Hearing Before Bankruptcy Court, #5 Exhibit E - Exhibits Admitted At Stay Hearing)(Patterson, Johnie) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Clerks Notice of Filing of an Appeal from an Order of the Bankruptcy Court. On 2/9/2021, Michael Lockwood filed a notice of appeal. The appeal has been assigned to U.S. District Judge Charles Eskridge, Civil Action 4:21-cv-456. Parties notified, filed. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal)(ShoshanaArnow, 4) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where B. Riley Financial, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where GLASSRATNER ADVISORY & CAPITAL GROUP LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John P Melko