This case was last updated from PACER on 11/16/2020 at 08:31:31 (UTC).

Lockton Management, LLC et al v. Jhaveri

Case Summary

On 09/17/2020 Lockton Management, LLC filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against Jhaveri. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Louis L. Stanton. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-07671

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Louis L. Stanton

 

Party Details

Petitioners

LOCKTON MANAGEMENT, LLC

LCM HOLDCO, LLC

LOCKTON CAPITAL MARKETS, LLC

Respondent

VISHAL JHAVERI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Michael Barry Carlinsky

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel

51 Madison Avenue, 22Nd Floor

New York, NY 10010

Ryan Adam Rakower

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan (NYC)

51 Madison Avenue

New York, NY 10010

Jennifer J. Barrett

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP

51 Madison Avenue, 22Nd Floor

New York, NY 10010

Respondent Attorneys

Douglas Holden Wigdor

Attorney at Wigdor LLP

85 Fifth Avenue, 5Th Fl.

New York, NY 10003

Renan F Varghese

Attorney at Wigdor LLP

85 Fifth Avenue, 5Th Fl.

New York, NY 10003

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by the undersigned counsel on behalf of the Parties, as follows: Jhaveri shall not pursue claims against Lockton for harassment, discrimination, retaliation, hostile work environment, alleged violations of the Civil Rights Act of 1964, the Civil Rights Act of 1866, the New York State Human Rights Law, the New York Labor Law, the New York City Human Rights Law, or any other claims in connection with or arising out of Jhaveri's employment by Lockton or the termination thereof, outside of the Arbitration or in any filing before a local, state or federal administrative agency. Jhaveri shall participate in the Arbitration; Jhaveri agrees that all claims for the Arbitration will be consolidated into a single hearing, and that the Arbitration will proceed in New York, NY; Lockton agrees to pay the fees of the AAA and the arbitrator in the Arbitration; Lockton's Petition (ECF No. 1) is withdrawn without prejudice; and The Court shall, at its discretion, retain jurisdiction to enforce the terms of this Stipulation and to enforce any award entered in the Arbitration. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 9/25/2020) (rro) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

#17

(#17) PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by LCM Holdco, LLC, Lockton Capital Markets, LLC, Lockton Management, LLC..(Barrett, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

#16

(#16) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Renan F Varghese on behalf of Vishal Jhaveri..(Varghese, Renan) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

#15

(#15) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Douglas Holden Wigdor on behalf of Vishal Jhaveri..(Wigdor, Douglas) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

#14

(#14) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Order to Show Cause for an Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order, Petition for an Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order and to Compel Arbitration, Memorandum of Law in Support of Petitioners' Application for an Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order and to Compel Arbitration, Summons served on Vishal Jhaveri c/o Douglas H. Wigdor on September 18, 2020. Service was made by E-Mail. Document filed by LCM Holdco, LLC, Lockton Capital Markets, LLC, Lockton Management, LLC..(Rakower, Ryan) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#13

(#13) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by LCM Holdco, LLC, Lockton Capital Markets, LLC, and Lockton Management, LLC. Respondent Vishal Jhaveri shall show cause as to why an order should not be issued enjoining Respondent and his counsel, agents, and anyone acting on his behalf, from pursuing claims against Lockton for alleged vio lations of the Civil Rights Act of 1964, the Civil Rights Act of 1866, the New York State Human Rights Law, the New York Labor Law, the New York City Human Rights Law, or any other claims in connection with or arising out of Jhaveri 's employment by Lockton or the termination thereof, outside of arbitration, and granting all other relief that may be appropriate; ORDERED that, good and sufficient reason having been shown therefor, pending the determination of Petitioners' motion for an injunction and to compel arbitration, Respondent andhis counsel, agents, and anyone acting on his behalf, are temporarily restrained and enjoined from taking any of the actions specified in above paragraph. Show Cause Hearing set for 9/30/2020 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 21C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Louis L. Stanton. Show Cause Response due by Noon, Monday Sept. 28. Replies due by noon, Wed., Sept. 30 (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 9/18/2020, 12:39 P.M.) (ml) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#12

(#12) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Vishal Jhaveri..(pne) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#11

No Description Available

#10

***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Document No. #10 Proposed Temporary Restraining Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (km) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ryan Adam Rakower on behalf of LCM HOLDCO, LLC, LOCKTON CAPITAL MARKETS, LLC, LOCKTON MANAGEMENT, LLC..(Rakower, Ryan) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jennifer J. Barrett on behalf of LCM HOLDCO, LLC, LOCKTON CAPITAL MARKETS, LLC, LOCKTON MANAGEMENT, LLC..(Barrett, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Barry Carlinsky on behalf of LCM HOLDCO, LLC, LOCKTON CAPITAL MARKETS, LLC, LOCKTON MANAGEMENT, LLC..(Carlinsky, Michael) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

#6

(#6) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by LOCKTON CAPITAL MARKETS, LLC..(Carlinsky, Michael) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

#5

(#5) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by LCM HOLDCO, LLC..(Carlinsky, Michael) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

#4

(#4) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by LOCKTON MANAGEMENT, LLC..(Carlinsky, Michael) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Vishal Jhaveri, re: #1 Petition (Other),. Document filed by LCM HOLDCO, LLC, LOCKTON CAPITAL MARKETS, LLC, LOCKTON MANAGEMENT, LLC..(Carlinsky, Michael) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Carlinsky, Michael) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

#1

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Vishal Jhaveri, re: #1 Petition (Other),. Document filed by LCM HOLDCO, LLC, LOCKTON CAPITAL MARKETS, LLC, LOCKTON MANAGEMENT, LLC..(Carlinsky, Michael) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by the undersigned counsel on behalf of the Parties, as follows: Jhaveri shall not pursue claims against Lockton for harassment, discrimination, retaliation, hostile work environment, alleged violations of the Civil Rights Act of 1964, the Civil Rights Act of 1866, the New York State Human Rights Law, the New York Labor Law, the New York City Human Rights Law, or any other claims in connection with or arising out of Jhaveri's employment by Lockton or the termination thereof, outside of the Arbitration or in any filing before a local, state or federal administrative agency. Jhaveri shall participate in the Arbitration; Jhaveri agrees that all claims for the Arbitration will be consolidated into a single hearing, and that the Arbitration will proceed in New York, NY; Lockton agrees to pay the fees of the AAA and the arbitrator in the Arbitration; Lockton's Petition (ECF No. 1) is withdrawn without prejudice; and The Court shall, at its discretion, retain jurisdiction to enforce the terms of this Stipulation and to enforce any award entered in the Arbitration. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 9/25/2020) (rro) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by LCM Holdco, LLC, Lockton Capital Markets, LLC, Lockton Management, LLC..(Barrett, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Renan F Varghese on behalf of Vishal Jhaveri..(Varghese, Renan) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Douglas Holden Wigdor on behalf of Vishal Jhaveri..(Wigdor, Douglas) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Order to Show Cause for an Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order, Petition for an Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order and to Compel Arbitration, Memorandum of Law in Support of Petitioners' Application for an Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order and to Compel Arbitration, Summons served on Vishal Jhaveri c/o Douglas H. Wigdor on September 18, 2020. Service was made by E-Mail. Document filed by LCM Holdco, LLC, Lockton Capital Markets, LLC, Lockton Management, LLC..(Rakower, Ryan) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by LCM Holdco, LLC, Lockton Capital Markets, LLC, and Lockton Management, LLC. Respondent Vishal Jhaveri shall show cause as to why an order should not be issued enjoining Respondent and his counsel, agents, and anyone acting on his behalf, from pursuing claims against Lockton for alleged vio lations of the Civil Rights Act of 1964, the Civil Rights Act of 1866, the New York State Human Rights Law, the New York Labor Law, the New York City Human Rights Law, or any other claims in connection with or arising out of Jhaveri 's employment by Lockton or the termination thereof, outside of arbitration, and granting all other relief that may be appropriate; ORDERED that, good and sufficient reason having been shown therefor, pending the determination of Petitioners' motion for an injunction and to compel arbitration, Respondent andhis counsel, agents, and anyone acting on his behalf, are temporarily restrained and enjoined from taking any of the actions specified in above paragraph. Show Cause Hearing set for 9/30/2020 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 21C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Louis L. Stanton. Show Cause Response due by Noon, Monday Sept. 28. Replies due by noon, Wed., Sept. 30 (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 9/18/2020, 12:39 P.M.) (ml) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Document No. #10 Proposed Temporary Restraining Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (km) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Michael Barry Carlinsky. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Vishal Jhaveri, LCM Holdco, LLC, Lockton Capital Markets, LLC, Lockton Management, LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps. (pne) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Vishal Jhaveri..(pne) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pne) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PROPOSED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Document filed by LCM HOLDCO, LLC, LOCKTON CAPITAL MARKETS, LLC, LOCKTON MANAGEMENT, LLC..(Carlinsky, Michael) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ryan Adam Rakower on behalf of LCM HOLDCO, LLC, LOCKTON CAPITAL MARKETS, LLC, LOCKTON MANAGEMENT, LLC..(Rakower, Ryan) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jennifer J. Barrett on behalf of LCM HOLDCO, LLC, LOCKTON CAPITAL MARKETS, LLC, LOCKTON MANAGEMENT, LLC..(Barrett, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Barry Carlinsky on behalf of LCM HOLDCO, LLC, LOCKTON CAPITAL MARKETS, LLC, LOCKTON MANAGEMENT, LLC..(Carlinsky, Michael) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by LOCKTON CAPITAL MARKETS, LLC..(Carlinsky, Michael) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by LCM HOLDCO, LLC..(Carlinsky, Michael) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by LOCKTON MANAGEMENT, LLC..(Carlinsky, Michael) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Vishal Jhaveri, re: #1 Petition (Other),. Document filed by LCM HOLDCO, LLC, LOCKTON CAPITAL MARKETS, LLC, LOCKTON MANAGEMENT, LLC..(Carlinsky, Michael) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Carlinsky, Michael) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR AN INJUNCTION AND TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND TO COMPEL ARBITRATION. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21714089).Document filed by LOCKTON MANAGEMENT, LLC, LOCKTON CAPITAL MARKETS, LLC, LCM HOLDCO, LLC..(Carlinsky, Michael) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less