This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/14/2021 at 09:39:03 (UTC).

Lockman v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 07/16/2021 Lockman filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert E. Blackburn and Michael E. Hegarty. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01947

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert E. Blackburn

Referral Judge

Michael E. Hegarty

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Toni Lockman

Defendant

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lori Jayne Tucker

Attorney at Tucker Law Office

3900 East Mexico Avenue, Suite 300

Denver, CO 80210

Sam C. Cannon

Attorney at Cannon Law

320 Maple Street, Suite 115

Fort Collins, CO 80521

Defendant Attorneys

Rebecca Kirsten Wagner

Attorney at Campbell Wagner Frazier & Dvorchak, LLC

5251 Dtc Parkway, Suite 400

Greenwood Village, CO 80111

Robert Alan Zahradnik-Mitchell

Attorney at Campbell Wagner Frazier & Dvorchak, LLC

5251 Dtc Parkway, Suite 400

Greenwood Village, CO 80111

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9 September 2021. Pursuant to the consent form filed by the parties declining consent under the D.C.Colo.LCivR 40.1(c) (ECF #15 ), the Court directs the Clerk of the Court to reassign this case under D.C.Colo.LCivR 40.1(a). This Court may continue on the case to hear matters referred by the district judge under 28 U.S.C. 636(b), Fed. R. Civ. P. 72 and D.C.Colo.LCivR 72.1(c). (cmadr, ) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

#15

(#15) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company All parties do not consent.. (Zahradnik-Mitchell, Robert) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

#14

(#14) Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 30 August 2021. Due to a conflict on the Court's calendar, the Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) Scheduling Conference set for September 15, 2021 is vacated and rescheduled for September 28, 2021, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom A-501, on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. The parties shall complete and file the Magistrate Judge Consent Form (ECF #6 ) on or before September 15, 2021. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

#13

(#13) Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 3 August 2021. Before the Court is Defendant's Response to Order to Show Cause (ECF #12 ). In light of the information provided by Defendant, this Court's Order (ECF #7 ) is discharged. Consent Form due by 9/2/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 9/8/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 9/15/2021 01:15 PM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

12 #2

Exhibit B - Email from Plaintiff's Attorney regarding Domicile

12 #1

Exhibit A - Plaintiff's State of Colorado Voter Registration

12 #12

Main Document

#11

(#11) Defendant's ANSWER to #4 Complaint and Jury Demand by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Zahradnik-Mitchell, Robert) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Sam Cannon by Sam C. Cannon on behalf of Toni LockmanAttorney Sam C. Cannon added to party Toni Lockman(pty:pla) (Cannon, Sam) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Lori Jayne Tucker on behalf of Toni LockmanAttorney Lori Jayne Tucker added to party Toni Lockman(pty:pla) (Tucker, Lori) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Robert Alan Zahradnik-Mitchell on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance CompanyAttorney Robert Alan Zahradnik-Mitchell added to party State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Zahradnik-Mitchell, Robert) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

#7

(#7) DISCHARGEDORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 19 July 2021. It is ORDERED that Defendant file a written response to this Order to Show Cause on or before August 2, 2021, demonstrating why the Court should not remand this case (or recommend that it be remanded) for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (cmadr, ) Modified pursuant to ECF #13 on 8/3/2021 (cmadr, ). (Entered: 07/19/2021)

#6

(#6) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (cpomm, ) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

#5

(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint upon State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company on 06/21/2021 (cpomm, ) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

#4

(#4) CIVIL COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, filed by Toni Lockman.(cpomm, ) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

1 #7

Exhibit A - Entry of Appearance

1 #6

Exhibit A - Affidavit of Service

1 #5

Exhibit A - Pretrial Order

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2021
  • Docket(#18) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. IT IS ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge:(1) To convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b), enter a Scheduling Order that satisfies the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, and enter such orders as appropriate to enforce the Scheduling order and resolve discovery matters; provided, further that the scheduling conference, the Magistrate Judge shall advise the parties of Judge Blackburns practice standards found at www.cod.uscourts.gov.;(2) To hear and finally determine non-dispositive matters that have been referred, subject to the exceptions found in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); and(3) To hear and make recommendations on dispositive matters that have been referred as defined in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLOLCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/10/21. Text Only Entry (rebsec) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #16 . All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-01947-REB. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, ) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9 September 2021. Pursuant to the consent form filed by the parties declining consent under the D.C.Colo.LCivR 40.1(c) (ECF #15 ), the Court directs the Clerk of the Court to reassign this case under D.C.Colo.LCivR 40.1(a). This Court may continue on the case to hear matters referred by the district judge under 28 U.S.C. 636(b), Fed. R. Civ. P. 72 and D.C.Colo.LCivR 72.1(c). (cmadr, ) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company All parties do not consent.. (Zahradnik-Mitchell, Robert) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 30 August 2021. Due to a conflict on the Court's calendar, the Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) Scheduling Conference set for September 15, 2021 is vacated and rescheduled for September 28, 2021, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom A-501, on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. The parties shall complete and file the Magistrate Judge Consent Form (ECF #6 ) on or before September 15, 2021. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 3 August 2021. Before the Court is Defendant's Response to Order to Show Cause (ECF #12 ). In light of the information provided by Defendant, this Court's Order (ECF #7 ) is discharged. Consent Form due by 9/2/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 9/8/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 9/15/2021 01:15 PM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #7 by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's State of Colorado Voter Registration, #2 Exhibit B - Email from Plaintiff's Attorney regarding Domicile)(Zahradnik-Mitchell, Robert) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Defendant's ANSWER to #4 Complaint and Jury Demand by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Zahradnik-Mitchell, Robert) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Sam Cannon by Sam C. Cannon on behalf of Toni LockmanAttorney Sam C. Cannon added to party Toni Lockman(pty:pla) (Cannon, Sam) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Lori Jayne Tucker on behalf of Toni LockmanAttorney Lori Jayne Tucker added to party Toni Lockman(pty:pla) (Tucker, Lori) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Robert Alan Zahradnik-Mitchell on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance CompanyAttorney Robert Alan Zahradnik-Mitchell added to party State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Zahradnik-Mitchell, Robert) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DISCHARGEDORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 19 July 2021. It is ORDERED that Defendant file a written response to this Order to Show Cause on or before August 2, 2021, demonstrating why the Court should not remand this case (or recommend that it be remanded) for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (cmadr, ) Modified pursuant to ECF #13 on 8/3/2021 (cmadr, ). (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (cpomm, ) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint upon State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company on 06/21/2021 (cpomm, ) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CIVIL COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, filed by Toni Lockman.(cpomm, ) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry (cpomm, ) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • Docket(#2) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (cpomm, ) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company from Denver County District Court, Case Number 2021CV31783. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number 1082-7964400), filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit A - Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A - Summons, #4 Exhibit A - DRO, #5 Exhibit A - Pretrial Order, #6 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Service, #7 Exhibit A - Entry of Appearance, #8 Exhibit A - Docket Sheet, #9 Exhibit B - Assessor info, #10 Exhibit C - SEC Form, #11 Civil Cover Sheet, #12 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(Wagner, Rebecca) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Alan Zahradnik-Mitchell

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rebecca Kirsten Wagner