This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/25/2020 at 09:21:08 (UTC).

Lockman et al v. Pioneer Natural Resources USA et al

Case Summary

On 07/27/2020 Lockman filed a Property - Land lawsuit against Pioneer Natural Resources USA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Montana District. The Judges overseeing this case are Brian Morris and John Johnston. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00067

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Land

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian Morris

Referral Judge

John Johnston

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Faith M. O'Connor

Dun O'Connor

Michael E. Lockman

Lockman, Inc.

Defendants

Murphy Oil USA

Murphy Exploration & Production Co.

John Does 1-30

Murphy Oil Corporation

Pioneer Natural Resources USA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael D. Cok

Attorney at COK KINZLER PLLP

35 North Bozeman Avenue

Bozeman, MT 59715

Travis W. Kinzler

Attorney at COK KINZLER PLLP

35 North Bozeman Avenue

Bozeman, MT 59715

Kyle W. Nelson

Attorney at GOETZ, BALDWIN & GEDDES, P.C.

35 North Grand, Po Box 6580

Bozeman, MT 59771-6580

Jonathan M. Cok

Attorney at COK KINZLER PLLP

35 North Bozeman Avenue

Bozeman, MT 59715

Richard J. Angell

Attorney at PARSONS BEHLE & LATIMER

201 S. Main Street, One Utah Center, Suite 1800

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Trent M. Gardner

Attorney at GOETZ, BALDWIN & GEDDES, P.C.

35 North Grand, Po Box 6580

Bozeman, MT 59771-6580

Defendant Attorneys

Scott M. DuBoff

Attorney at FOSTER GARVEY PC

1000 Potomac Street, Nw, Suite 200

Washington, DC 20007

John Ray Nelson

Attorney at FOSTER GARVEY PC

618 W. Riverside Ave, #300

Spokane, WA 99201

Leonard H. Smith

Attorney at CROWLEY FLECK, PLLP - BOZEMAN

1915 South 19Th Avenue, Po Box 10969

Bozeman, MT 59719-0969

W. Scott Mitchell

Attorney at HOLLAND & HART

Po Box 639

Billings, MT 59103-0639

William W. Mercer

Attorney at HOLLAND & HART - BILLINGS

401 North 31St Street, Suite 1500

Billings, MT 59101-1277

Matthew Dolphay

Attorney at HOLLAND & HART - BILLINGS

401 North 31St Street, Suite 1500

Billings, MT 59101-1277

 

Court Documents

#15

#14

#13

12 #2

Text of Proposed Order

12 #1

Exhibit A-Declaration of John Ray Nelson

#12

11 #2

Text of Proposed Order

11 #1

Exhibit A-Declaration of Scott M. DuBoff

#11

#10

#9

8 #1

Text of Proposed Order PROPOSED Order

#8

1 #4

Blank Summons - Murphy Oil USA

1 #3

Blank Summons - Murphy Oil Corporation

1 #2

Blank Summons - Murphy Exploration

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketRemark: PHV Counsel John Nelson is now a registered CM/ECF electronic user. (ACC) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Letter from Tyler P. Gilman, Clerk of Court, to PHV Counsel John Ray Nelson re CM/ECF registration. (Copy mailed to counsel) (MMS) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Letter from Tyler P. Gilman, Clerk of Court, to PHV Counsel Scott DeBoff re CM/ECF registration. (Copy mailed to counsel) (MMS) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Scott M. DeBoff ; granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to John Ray Nelson. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 10/7/2020. PLEASE SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 9/22/2020. (MMS) (Copy of order mailed to counsel) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION John Ray Nelson to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number MTX900015394.) Leonard H. Smith appearing for Defendants Murphy Exploration & Production Co., Murphy Oil Corporation, Murphy Oil USA Motions referred to John Johnston. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Declaration of John Ray Nelson, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Smith, Leonard) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION Scott M. DuBoff to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number MTX900015394.) Leonard H. Smith appearing for Defendants Murphy Exploration & Production Co., Murphy Oil Corporation, Murphy Oil USA Motions referred to John Johnston. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Declaration of Scott M. DuBoff, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Smith, Leonard) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Mailing of Consent - Honorable John Johnston as Presiding Judge. Electronicially mailed to counsel Michael D. Cok, Travis W. Kinzler, Richard J. Angell, Jonathan M. Cok, Trent M. Gardner, Kyle W. Nelson, Leonard H. Smith, William W. Mercer.Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 10/1/2020. (ACC) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Pioneer Natural Resources USA, Inc. is granted an enlargement of time until November 9, 2020, to serve a pleading responsive to the #1 Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial in this action or a motion pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 9/14/2020. (ACC) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT PIONEER NATURAL RESOURCES USA, INC. TO FILE AN ANSWER OR MOTION PURSUANT TO RULE 12(b)(6) OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE William W. Mercer appearing for Defendant Pioneer Natural Resources USA Motions referred to John Johnston. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order PROPOSED Order) (Mercer, William) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by William W. Mercer on behalf of Pioneer Natural Resources USA (Mercer, William) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Murphy Oil Defendants shall have up to and including November 9, 2020 to file their answer to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 9/1/2020. (ACC) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint Leonard H. Smith appearing for Defendants Murphy Exploration & Production Co., Murphy Oil Corporation, Murphy Oil USA Motions referred to John Johnston. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Smith, Leonard) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Pioneer Natural Resources USA. (MMS) (Original e-mailed to counsel) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Submission of Proposed Summons as to Pioneer Natural Resources USA, re #1 Complaint, (Nelson, Kyle) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Murphy Exploration & Production Co., Murphy Oil Corporation, Murphy Oil USA. (Summonses emailed to Counsel Nelson). (Attachments: #1 Issued Summons - Murphy Oil Corporation, #2 Issued Summons - Murphy Oil USA) (SLR) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketFiling fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 0977-2517643. (SLR) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against All Defendants, filed by Lockman, Inc., Michael E. Lockman, Dun O'Connor, Faith M. O'Connor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Blank Summons - Murphy Exploration, #3 Blank Summons - Murphy Oil Corporation, #4 Blank Summons - Murphy Oil USA) (SLR) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Murphy Exploration & Production Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Pioneer Natural Resources Company is a litigant

Latest cases where MURPHY OIL USA INC is a litigant