This case was last updated from PACER on 12/18/2020 at 09:58:47 (UTC).

LOCKHART v. KEARNS

Case Summary

On 10/19/2020 LOCKHART filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against KEARNS. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is JOSHUA D. WOLSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-05264

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOSHUA D. WOLSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZIKIYA LOCKHART

Defendant

JEROME KEARNS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DANIEL E. KLEINER

Attorney at METZGER & KLEINER

Two Penn Center, Suite 1204, 15Th St. & Jfk Blvd.

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Defendant Attorneys

JAMES J. DODD-O

Attorney at THOMAS, THOMAS AND HAFER LLP

1550 Pond Road Suite 210

Allentown, PA 19104

MICHAEL WEINERT

Attorney at Thomas, Thomas & Hafer LLP

1550 Pond Road, Suite 210

Allentown, PA 18104

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by JEROME KEARNS.(WEINERT, MICHAEL) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES J. DODD-O on behalf of JEROME KEARNS with Certificate of Service(DODD-O, JAMES) *FILED IN ERROR BY INCORRECT ATTORNEY* Modified on 12/9/2020 (lisad, ). (Entered: 12/08/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES J. DODD-O on behalf of JEROME KEARNS with Certificate of Service(DODD-O, JAMES) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES J. DODD-O on behalf of JEROME KEARNS with certificate of service(DODD-O, JAMES) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against JEROME KEARNS (Filing fee $ 400.), filed by ZIKIYA LOCKHART. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bw, ) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by JEROME KEARNS.(WEINERT, MICHAEL) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES J. DODD-O on behalf of JEROME KEARNS with Certificate of Service(DODD-O, JAMES) *FILED IN ERROR BY INCORRECT ATTORNEY* Modified on 12/9/2020 (lisad, ). (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES J. DODD-O on behalf of JEROME KEARNS with Certificate of Service(DODD-O, JAMES) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES J. DODD-O on behalf of JEROME KEARNS with certificate of service(DODD-O, JAMES) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketFiling fee: $ 400.00, receipt number PPE220274 (dmc, ) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketCase Eligible for Arbitration(lisad, ) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued as to JEROME KEARNS. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 10/22/2020 (bw, ) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against JEROME KEARNS (Filing fee $ 400.), filed by ZIKIYA LOCKHART. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bw, ) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less