This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/27/2023 at 07:17:52 (UTC).

Lockhart v. Begor et al

Case Summary

On 01/26/2023 Lockhart filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Begor. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nebraska District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Pro Se Docket and Joseph F. Bataillon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:23-CV-00033

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Pro Se Docket

Presiding Judge

Joseph F. Bataillon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Charles Lockhart

Defendants

Mark Begor

Equifax LLC

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) AFFIDAVIT in Support of Complaint on behalf of Plaintiff Charles Lockhart. (LKO) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

#3

(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on behalf of Plaintiff Charles Lockhart. (LKO) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

#4

(#4) MOTION for Summons on behalf of Plaintiff Charles Lockhart. (LKO) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

#6

(#6) NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

#7

(#7) GENERAL ORDER NO. 2022-04: This general order provides for the management and assignment of cases filed by a plaintiff or petitioner without counsel. This general order also includes the definition of the pro se docket, responsibilities of the pro se law clerks and scheduling and discovery requirements in pro se cases. Ordered by Chief Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr.. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LKO) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

#8

(#8) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on behalf of Plaintiff Charles Lockhart. (LRM) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

#9

(#9) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, Filing No. 3; Filing No. 8, is granted, and the Complaint shall be filed without payment of fees. Plaintiff's Motion for Summons, Filing No. 4, is denied as premature. Plaintiff is advised that the next step in his case will be for the Court to conduct an initial review of his claims to determine whether summary dismissal is appropriate under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). The Court will conduct this initial review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(ADB) (Entered: 02/08/2023)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, Filing No. 3; Filing No. 8, is granted, and the Complaint shall be filed without payment of fees. Plaintiff's Motion for Summons, Filing No. 4, is denied as premature. Plaintiff is advised that the next step in his case will be for the Court to conduct an initial review of his claims to determine whether summary dismissal is appropriate under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). The Court will conduct this initial review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(ADB) (Entered: 02/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on behalf of Plaintiff Charles Lockhart. (LRM) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) GENERAL ORDER NO. 2022-04: This general order provides for the management and assignment of cases filed by a plaintiff or petitioner without counsel. This general order also includes the definition of the pro se docket, responsibilities of the pro se law clerks and scheduling and discovery requirements in pro se cases. Ordered by Chief Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr.. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LKO) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) TEXT NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY by Deputy Clerk that the Complaint - Pro Se #1 and Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis #3 has been filed and is considered deficient because the document is not signed. The plaintiff shall correct the deficiency within 14 days of the date of this entry or the pleading may be stricken from the record of this case. See NECivR 11.1.(LKO) Modified on 2/2/2023 to reflect deficiency was satisfied on 2/1/2023 (LRM). (Entered: 01/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Summons on behalf of Plaintiff Charles Lockhart. (LKO) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on behalf of Plaintiff Charles Lockhart. (LKO) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) AFFIDAVIT in Support of Complaint on behalf of Plaintiff Charles Lockhart. (LKO) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against Mark Begor and Equifax LLC filed on behalf of pro se plaintiff Charles Lockhart. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LKO) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/2/2023: #2 Signed complaint) (LRM). Modified on 2/2/2023 to add document with signature (LRM). (Entered: 01/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less